North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Conrad, Jr
Case #: 3:22-cv-00094
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2022
Terminated:Oct 19, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 04, 2022 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Jennifer S. Johnson
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
David McDowell
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nadine Mooney
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tracy A. Toland
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wells Fargo N.A.
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Charles Stokes
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiya Cunningham
2764 Pleasant Rd Suite A
Fort Mill, SC 29708


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
27 27 4 pgs appeal Opinion - USCA Fri 05/09 2:27 PM
Unpublished Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals as to23 Notice of Appeal. 4th Circuit decision - Affirmed.(llp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Judgment
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
26 26 2 pgs appeal Order - USCA Wed 11/08 6:41 AM
ORDER of USCA as to23 Notice of Appeal consolidating case 23-1978 with 23-1977 (nvc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
appeal Appeal Filing Fee Received Mon 10/16 11:43 AM
Appeal Filing fee received: in amount of $ 505, receipt number 6170 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
25 25 appeal Case Number - Court of Appeals Mon 09/18 2:12 PM
USCA Case Number 23-1978 for23 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Jeffrey S. Neal. (nvc)
Related: [-]
appeal Electronic Record Transmitted Mon 09/18 2:36 PM
Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re:23 Notice of Appeal 23-1978 . (nvc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
24 24 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA Thu 09/14 2:53 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re23 Notice of Appeal (cjs)
Related: [-]
23 23 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 09/14 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,15 Clerk's Judgment,22 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Reopen Case, by Kiya Cunningham. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
22 22 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion to Reopen Case Wed 09/06 11:49 AM
ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration re: 14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, 15 Clerk's Judgment as to Kiya Cunningham. Signed by Senior District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/5/2023. (brl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
21 21 respm Surreply Mon 12/19 9:29 AM
Pro Se Surreply as to16 MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,15 Clerk's Judgment MOTION to Reopen Case by Kiya Cunningham.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 09, 2022
20 20 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/12 1:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kiya Cunningham re19 Reply to Response to Motion, (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/09 8:55 AM
Pro Se REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,15 Clerk's Judgment MOTION to Reopen Case by Kiya Cunningham.(tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits - Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibits - Part 2
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/30 5:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,15 Clerk's Judgment MOTION to Reopen Case by Jennifer S. Johnson, David McDowell, Nadine Mooney, Charles Stokes, Tracy A. Toland, Wells Fargo N.A.. Replies due by 12/7/2022(Dalton, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Order Dismissing Partial Claims Against WF,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment
Monday, November 21, 2022
17 17 misc Request to Receive Electronic Notification Mon 11/21 12:23 PM
Pro Se Request to Receive Electronic Notification by Kiya Cunningham. (cjs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
16 16 motion Reconsideration Reopen Case Thu 11/17 9:58 AM
Pro Se MOTION for Reconsideration re14 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,15 Clerk's Judgment, Pro Se MOTION to Reopen Case by Kiya Cunningham. Responses due by 11/30/2022 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
15 15 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 10/19 2:01 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/19/2022. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
14 14 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/19 2:00 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/19/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
13 13 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/14 5:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer S. Johnson, David McDowell, Nadine Mooney, Charles Stokes, Tracy A. Toland, Wells Fargo N.A.. Replies due by 10/21/2022 (Dalton, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time Fri 10/07 1:16 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Kiya Cunningham. Responses due by 10/21/2022 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order Setting Response Deadline Wed 09/21 4:12 PM
ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's 7 MOTION to Dismiss or file an amended complaint no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Responses due by 10/5/2022. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/21/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/14 12:10 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re:1 Complaint by Kiya Cunningham. Responses due by 9/28/2022 (tlj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 07/06 7:38 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 8/22/2022. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/6/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time Fri 07/01 11:32 AM
Pro Se MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Kiya Cunningham. Responses due by 7/15/2022 (ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
8 8 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 06/22 5:02 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer S. Johnson, David McDowell, Nadine Mooney, Charles Stokes, Tracy A. Toland, Wells Fargo N.A..(Dalton, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Charles Stokes
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 06/22 5:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jennifer S. Johnson, David McDowell, Nadine Mooney, Charles Stokes, Tracy A. Toland, Wells Fargo N.A.. Responses due by 7/6/2022 (Dalton, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/06 2:49 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tracy A. Toland answer due 6/22/2022. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 6/6/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time Fri 06/03 3:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Tracy A. Toland. (Dalton, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Tracy Toland's Motion for Extension of Time
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/03 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiya Cunningham. Charles Stokes served on 5/11/2022, answer due 6/1/2022. (tlj)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/03 10:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiya Cunningham. Tracy A. Toland served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (tlj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/27 11:35 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jennifer S. Johnson, David McDowell, Nadine Mooney, and Wells Fargo N.A. answer due 6/22/2022. Entered by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/27/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
3 3 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/26 5:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Jennifer S. Johnson, David McDowell, Nadine Mooney, Charles Stokes, Tracy A. Toland, Wells Fargo N.A.. (Dalton, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/09 11:25 AM
Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (js)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/09 9:33 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
1 1 3 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/09 9:31 AM
Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CHD070233), filed by Kiya Cunningham.(js)
Related: [-]