Original Case: 3:22-cv-00094

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv.pr-01978
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NADINE MOONEY
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JENNIFER S. JOHNSON, a/k/a Jennifer Peach
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TRACY A. TOLAND
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID MCDOWELL
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLES STOKES, a/k/a Chuck Stokes
Represented By
Kevin Joseph Dalton
FISHER & PHILLIPS, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KIYA CUNNINGHAM
Represented By
Kiya Cunningham
contact info

GPO May 09 2025
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--granting Motion to strike [1001497895-2]; denying Motion to extend filing time [1001497908-2]. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00528-FDW. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1001767506] [23-1977, 23-1978]

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 5:55 AM EDT
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:22-cv-00094-RJC. Case manager: JeffNeal. [1001440949] 23-1978 JSN [Entered: 09/18/2023 02:03 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Kiya Cunningham - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 10/18/2023. Originating case number: 3:22-cv-00094-RJC. Mailed to: Kiya Cunningham. [1001440953] 23-1978 JSN [Entered: 09/18/2023 02:04 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. [1001440957] Informal Opening Brief due 10/12/2023. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Kiya Cunningham. 23-1978 JSN [Entered: 09/18/2023 02:06 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001440959]. Due: 10/02/2023. 23-1978 JSN [Entered: 09/18/2023 02:07 PM]
Related: [-]