Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:14-bk-11996
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Oct 15, 2014
Claims Deadline:Dec 15, 2014
Dismissed:Dec 21, 2015
Terminated:Aug 01, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mineral Park, Inc.
8275 N Mineral Park Rd
Golden Valley, AZ 86413-8783
Represented By
D. Sam Anderson
Bernstein Shur Sawyer & Nelson, PA
contact info
Jeremy V. Richards
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Maxim B. Litvak
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Mineral Park, Inc.
Represented By
Edwin H. Caldie
Leonard Streetland And Deinard LLP
contact info
Adam Hiller
Hiller & Arban, LLC
contact info
Alisa C. Lacey
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
contact info
Brian L. Arban
Hiller & Arban, LLC
contact info
Johnna M. Darby
Hiller & Arban, LLC
contact info
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Tiiara N. A. Patton
Dep'T Of Justice -Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Mohave County settles mine bankruptcy case for $4.45 million (havasunews.com)
Submitted Fri 08/07/2015
2. Supervisors hold special meeting today on Mineral Park bankruptcy (mohavedailynews.com)
Submitted Thu 08/06/2015
3. Mohave County negotiates legal contract in mine bankruptcy (havasunews.com)
Submitted Wed 04/08/2015
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Thursday, April 20, 2017
792 792 notice Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice Thu 04/20 10:41 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Thomas D. Walsh has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Acton Welding, Inc., Freiday Construction, Inc.. (Walsh, Thomas)
Related: [-]