Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-11996

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:14-bk-11997
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2014
Dismissed:Dec 21, 2015
Terminated:Aug 01, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bluefish Energy Corporation
8275 N Mineral Park Rd
Golden Valley, AZ 86413-8783
Represented By
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Monday, August 01, 2016
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 08/01 1:17 PM
Bankruptcy Case 14-11997 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
11 11 claims Claims Register Wed 01/06 2:57 PM
Final Claims Register (Alphabetical) . Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Final Claims Register (Numerical)
Monday, December 21, 2015
10 10 order Order Mon 12/21 2:17 PM
Order (A) Dismissing Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Providing Certain Relief in Connection with the Foregoing for the Debtors' Claims Agent Order Signed on 12/21/2015 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 11, 2014
9 9 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 10/11 12:01 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Bluefish Energy Corporation Filed by Bluefish Energy Corporation. (O'Neill, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 10, 2014
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 10/10 11:59 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of Bluefish Energy Corporation Filed by Bluefish Energy Corporation. (O'Neill, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 04, 2014
7 7 misc Exhibit Thu 09/04 10:11 PM
Revised Consolidated List of Creditors Holding 30 Largest Unsecured Claims. Related [+] Filed by Bluefish Energy Corporation. (O'Neill, James) Modified docket text on 9/5/2014 (LMD)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
6 6 utility Corrective Entry Tue 09/02 1:17 PM
Corrective Entry ~ Due to contents of confidential information, per the request of the filer, the image of the creditor matrix has been replaced with a redacted copy. Related [+] (TMB)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
5 5 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Tue 09/02 10:22 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Creditor Matrix (Filed with Petition) Related [+] Filed by Bluefish Energy Corporation. (O'Neill, James)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, August 27, 2014
4 4 crditcrd none Wed 08/27 4:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-11997 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7243842, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Wed 08/27 3:45 PM
Order of Reassignment Signed on 8/27/2014 (LCN)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 08/27 1:18 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An order (the "Joint Administration Order") has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below for procedural purposes only. The docket in Case No. 14-11996 KG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Mineral Park, Inc. (Case No. 14-11996 KG); Bluefish Energy Corporation (Case No. 14-11997 KG); Mercator Mineral Park Holdings Ltd. (Case No. 14-11998 KG); and Lodestrike Resources Ltd. (Case No. 14-11999 KG). Signed on 8/27/2014 (LMD)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Wed 08/27 3:46 PM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 26, 2014
court Case Assigned Tue 08/26 8:12 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 25, 2014
1 1 4 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Bluefish Energy Corporation. (O'Neill, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Board Resolutions
Att: 2 Top 30 with Cert
Att: 3 Equity Holders
Att: 4 Creditor Matrix
Att: 5 Cert for Creditor Matrix
Att: 6 Corporate Ownership Statement