New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:22-cv-02070
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331bc Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2022
Re-opened:Mar 23, 2023
Terminated:Apr 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 10, 2022 6:50 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
AirBridgeCargo Airlines, LLC
Represented By
Gabrielle Yvonne Vazquez
Mcgrail & Bensinger
contact info
Counter Defendant
BOC Aviation Limited
Represented By
John Gerard McCarthy, Sr
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Edward Joseph Heppt
Smith Gamrell & Russel, LLP
contact info
Defendant
AirBridgeCargo Airlines, LLC
Represented By
Gabrielle Yvonne Vazquez
Mcgrail & Bensinger
contact info
Plaintiff
BOC Aviation Limited
Represented By
John Gerard McCarthy, Sr
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Edward Joseph Heppt
Smith Gamrell & Russel, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 25, 2024
186 186 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 04/25 11:46 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:174 Clerk's Judgment168 Clerk's Judgment170 Judgment on Attorney Fees in the amount of $409,197,102.71. Judgment satisfied on 04/23/2024.(km)
Related: [-]
185 185 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 04/25 10:49 AM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by BOC Aviation Limited..(McCarthy, John) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]