Original Case: 1:22-cv-02070

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00785
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:May 09, 2023
Terminated:Jul 20, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 25, 2023 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
AirBridgeCargo Airlines, LLC
Represented By
Gabrielle Y. Vazquez
McGrail & Bensinger LLP
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
VolgaDnepr Logistics B.V.
Represented By
Gabrielle Y. Vazquez
McGrail & Bensinger LLP
contact info
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
Volga-Dnepr Logistics B.V.
Represented By
Gabrielle Y. Vazquez
McGrail & Bensinger LLP
contact info
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
BOC Aviation Limited
Represented By
John Gerard McCarthy
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Edward J. Heppt
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2023 4:35 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant AirBridgeCargo Airlines, LLC and Volga-Dnepr Logistics B.V., FILED. [3513526] [23-785] [Entered: 05/10/2023 03:25 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 25 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/11/2023, RECEIVED.[3513534] [23-785] [Entered: 05/10/2023 03:28 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/03/2023, RECEIVED.[3513536] [23-785] [Entered: 05/10/2023 03:28 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant AirBridgeCargo Airlines, LLC and Volga-Dnepr Logistics B.V., district court receipt # ANYSDC-27713236, FILED.[3513538] [23-785] [Entered: 05/10/2023 03:29 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3513544] [23-785] [Entered: 05/10/2023 03:30 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 24 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED