Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01058
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2022
Terminated:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC
Represented By
A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
31 31 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 10/24 9:02 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment for AP Case
30 30 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Tue 10/24 8:53 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Stephen T Loden is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 29: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Satisfaction of Judgment. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. Tickle Due Date 10/27/2023. (mjb)
Related: [-] 29 Notice
Monday, October 23, 2023
29 29 notice Notice Mon 10/23 1:10 PM
Notice Re: Satisfaction of Judgment. Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment for AP Case
Friday, September 23, 2022
28 28 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 09/23 12:30 PM
Receipt of Request for Exemplification of Document([LINK 22-01058 EEB] ) [misc,reqexema] ( 23.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31536276. Fee amount 23.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Request for Exemplification of Document (fee) Fri 09/23 12:29 PM
Exemplification Request for Related [+] Fee Amount $23 Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment for AP Case21 Judgment for AP Case
26 26 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Fri 09/23 8:43 AM
Certificate of Judgment for Lien Upon Land and Tenements (Abstract/Transcript of Judgment) Related [+]. (mmm)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment for AP Case, 24 Request for Certification of Document (fee)
25 25 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 09/23 6:40 AM
Receipt of Request for Certification of Document (fee)([LINK 22-01058 EEB] ) [misc,certcopa] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31534774. Fee amount 11.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Request for Certification of Document (fee) Fri 09/23 6:36 AM
Certification Request for Judgment at Docket Number 21. Send Certified Document(s) to nan.sauter@diamondmccarthy.com Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment for AP Case
Friday, August 12, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/12 9:17 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-1058 EEB Closed. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 30, 2022
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/30 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment for AP Case
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/30 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, July 28, 2022
21 21 order Judgment for AP Case Thu 07/28 3:51 PM
Judgment For Plaintiff, Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee Against Defendant, A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Related [+]. ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim, and against the Defendant A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC, for damages in the amount of $52,403.04, together with post-judgment interest from the date of entry of judgment until the judgment is paid in full pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1961.
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
20 20 order Default Judgment Thu 07/28 3:43 PM
Order Granting Creditor Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. The Motion is GRANTED. The Court will enter a Judgment in favor of Plaintiff for damages.
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 07/28 4:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01058 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 8/11/2022 to close AP. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/20 9:32 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
18 18 motion Default Judgment Wed 07/13 12:01 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of D. Brian Crisp
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Christopher D. Johnson
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Att: 4 Proposed Judgment
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/29 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Clerks Entry of Default
Monday, June 27, 2022
16 16 order Virtual Clerks Entry of Default Mon 06/27 9:11 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, June 24, 2022
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/24 12:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default
14 14 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/24 12:37 PM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
13 13 order Show Cause Tue 06/21 12:11 PM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before July 12, 2022, Plaintiff shall file with the court a motion for clerks entry of default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), or a request for the issuance of an alias summons, or shall otherwise show cause in writing why this adversary proceeding should not be dismissed, failing which the court may enter its order dismissing this matter.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,10 Order on Motion for Alias Summons
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
12 12 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 05/11 1:33 PM
Summons Service Executed On: A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Alias Summons Wed 05/11 10:51 AM
Alias Summons Issued on A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Answer Due 6/10/2022. Related [+]
Related: [-]
10 10 order Alias Summons Wed 05/11 10:47 AM
Order Granting Motion To Issue Alias Summons Related [+].
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Alias Summons
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
9 9 motion Alias Summons Tue 05/10 2:47 PM
Motion For Alias Summons Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Alias Summons
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, April 25, 2022
8 8 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Mon 04/25 6:29 PM
Summons Service Executed On: A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
7 7 court Alias Summons Thu 04/21 8:38 AM
Alias Summons Issued on A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Answer Due 5/23/2022. Related [+]
Related: [-]
6 6 order Alias Summons Thu 04/21 8:35 AM
Order Granting Issuance of Alias Summons Related [+]. HEREBY ORDERS the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court to issue an aliassummons. The Plaintiffs must then file a Certificate of Service with the Court evidencing the same.
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Alias Summons
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
5 5 motion Alias Summons Tue 04/19 10:02 AM
Motion For Alias Summons Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 04/05 2:57 PM
Summons Service Executed On: A1 CONDUCTOR & RATHOLE, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 03/22 12:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01058 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31182570. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/21 4:19 PM
Summons Issued on A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC Answer Due 04/20/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/21 4:18 PM
Adversary case 22-01058 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against A1 Conductor & Rathole, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/19/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Cover Sheet