Kim v. Camp Service and Repair, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01060 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Camp Service and Repair, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 06/27 7:40 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01060 EEB Closed. (jc) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 06/10 4:55 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-1060 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 6/24/2022 to close AP. |
||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Thu 06/09 11:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Show Cause
Fri 05/27 2:53 PM
Order to Show Cause . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before twenty-one (21) days after the date of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall file with the court a motion for clerks entry of default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), or a request for the issuance of an alias summons, or shall otherwise show cause in writing why this adversary proceedingshould not be dismissed, failing which the court may enter its order dismissing this matter. |
|
Saturday, April 23, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/23 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/23 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Compliance With Rules
Thu 04/21 3:05 PM
Order For Compliance To Attorney Robert Alan Byrd . ORDERED that on or before May 5, 2022, Robert Alan Byrd shall promptly comply with LBR 9010-1(b)(2) and file proof of such compliance with this Court, failing which, future pleadings on behalf of the Defendant Camp Service and Repair, LLC, may be stricken and he will be unable to appear in front of this Court. |
|
6 | 6
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/21 2:57 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Camp Service and Repair, LLC. Camp Service and Repair, LLC Answer Due 5/20/2022 . |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/19 1:48 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Tue 04/05 3:09 PM
Summons Service Executed On: CAMP SERVICE AND REPAIR, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/22 12:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01060 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31182570. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 03/21 4:42 PM
Summons Issued on Camp Service and Repair, LLC Answer Due 04/20/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/21 4:34 PM
Adversary case 22-01060 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Camp Service and Repair, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/19/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Other Cover Sheet |