Kim v. Ezzie's Wholesale, Inc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01062 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Ezzie's Wholesale, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 06/13 3:13 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01062 EEB Closed. |
||
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Fri 05/27 7:51 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 05/27 5:07 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01062 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 6/10/2022 to close Adversary Proceeding. |
||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/14 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/12 2:22 PM
Order Extending Deadline To File Responsive Pleading. Ezzie's Wholesale, Inc Answer Due 5/20/2022 . |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/11 2:08 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation (No Order Requested)
Mon 04/11 1:50 PM
Stipulation Between Thomas M. Kim and Ezzie's Wholesale, Inc. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Tue 04/05 3:19 PM
Summons Service Executed On: EZZIE'S WHOLESALE, INC. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/22 12:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01062 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31182570. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 03/21 5:03 PM
Summons Issued on Ezzie's Wholesale, Inc Answer Due 04/20/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/21 5:00 PM
Adversary case 22-01062 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Ezzie's Wholesale, Inc. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/19/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Other Cover Sheet |