Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01064
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2022
Terminated:Jun 06, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gustavson Associates, LLC
Represented By
Gustavson Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, June 06, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/06 3:47 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01064 EEB Closed. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 05/20 1:40 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01064 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 6/3/2022 to close AP. No answer filed. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Thu 05/19 10:02 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 12, 2022
5 5 order Show Cause Thu 05/12 7:08 AM
Order to Show Cause Related [+]. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before twenty-one (21) days after the date of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall file with the court a motion for clerks entry of default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), or a request for the issuance of an alias summons, or shall otherwise show cause in writing why this adversary proceeding should not be dismissed, failing which the court may enter its order dismissing this matter.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 04/05 4:50 PM
Summons Service Executed On: GUSTAVSON ASSOCIATES, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 03/22 12:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01064 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31182570. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/21 5:14 PM
Summons Issued on Gustavson Associates, LLC Answer Due 04/20/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/21 5:13 PM
Adversary case 22-01064 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Gustavson Associates, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/19/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Cover Sheet