Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01071
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Terminated:Dec 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Planning Thru Completion, LLC
Represented By
Planning Thru Completion, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, December 29, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/29 10:49 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01071 EEB Closed. (jc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial) Wed 12/14 6:55 AM
Joint Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 12/14 7:01 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01071 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
20 20 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Tue 12/13 3:21 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Christopher D. Johnson is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 19: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial). Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation
Monday, December 12, 2022
19 19 misc Stipulation (No Order Requested) Mon 12/12 11:54 AM
Joint Stipulation Between Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Planning Thru Completion, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
18 18 order File Wed 11/30 10:31 AM
Order to File Status Report Related [+]. Document due by 12/14/2022 for1 , (jss)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, August 26, 2022
17 17 order Abeyance Fri 08/26 9:01 AM
Order Approving Agreed Motion for Order Holding Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 11/23/2022 for16 , (jc)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Thursday, August 25, 2022
16 16 motion Abeyance Thu 08/25 12:52 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
15 15 order File Tue 07/26 3:56 PM
Order For Compliance With Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) Related [+]. Written Report due by 8/25/2022 for1 , (jc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, July 25, 2022
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/25 7:35 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, June 24, 2022
13 13 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 06/24 2:28 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Planning Thru Completion, LLC to Respond to Original Complaint. Planning Thru Completion, LLC Answer Due 7/25/2022 Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
12 12 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 06/24 9:49 AM
Third Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, May 26, 2022
11 11 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 05/26 4:39 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Planning Thru Completion, LLC to Respond to Original Complaint Answer Due 6/24/2022 Related [+]. (dg)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
10 10 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 05/25 5:25 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
9 9 misc Stipulation (No Order Requested) Wed 05/25 12:27 PM
Second Stipulation Between Planning Thru Completion, LLC and Plaintiff Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, April 25, 2022
8 8 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/25 12:41 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Planning Thru Completion, LLC. Planning Thru Completion, LLC Answer Due 5/25/2022 Related [+].
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
7 7 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/25 9:21 AM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
6 6 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Mon 04/25 8:44 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Megan M. Adeyemo is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 5: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the "Adversary", "Motion", "Extend Time To File Answer To Complaint". Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+].
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Friday, April 22, 2022
5 5 misc Stipulation (No Order Requested) Fri 04/22 3:12 PM
This entry was docketed in error using the incorrect event. Refer to Document #7 per CM request. Stipulation Between Planning Thru Completion, LLC and Plaintiff Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Planning Thru Completion, LLC. (Adeyemo, Megan) Modified on 4/25/2022 (jc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 04/05 4:57 PM
Summons Service Executed On: PLANNING THRU COMPLETION, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 03/25 9:26 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01071 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31189513. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/24 1:58 PM
Summons Issued on Planning Thru Completion, LLC Answer Due 04/25/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/24 1:46 PM
Adversary case 22-01071 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Planning Thru Completion, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/22/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]