Kim v. T.W. McGuire & Associates, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01074 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
T.W. McGuire & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 05/23 7:15 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01074 EEB Closed. (jc) |
||
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Fri 05/13 1:29 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 05/13 2:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01074 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc) |
||
Sunday, May 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/01 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2022. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/01 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Compliance With Rules
Fri 04/29 4:15 PM
Order For Compliance To Attorney Robert Alan Byrd . Rules Compliance due by 5/13/2022 (jc) |
|
6 | 6
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/29 4:11 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant T.W. McGuire & Associates, Inc. Answer Due 5/25/2022 . (jc) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/27 3:29 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Tue 04/05 5:02 PM
Summons Service Executed On: T.W. MCGUIRE & ASSOCIATES, INC. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 03/25 9:26 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01074 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31189513. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 03/24 2:45 PM
Summons Issued on T.W. McGuire & Associates, Inc. Answer Due 04/25/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/24 2:41 PM
Adversary case 22-01074 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against T.W. McGuire & Associates, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/22/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |