Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01077
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Capstar Drilling, Inc.
Represented By
Capstar Drilling, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
40 40 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Wed 04/17 1:54 PM
Document Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
39 39 order Reschedule Hearing Tue 04/02 12:08 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Trial Scheduling Conference Related [+]. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT a telephonic trial scheduling conference in the within adversary proceeding is hereby scheduled for Monday, April 29, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.
Related: [-] 38 Order to Vacate Hearing
Thursday, January 25, 2024
38 38 order Vacate Hearing Thu 01/25 4:20 PM
Order and Notice of Vacated Hearing Related [+]. (rjr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 22, 2024
37 37 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Mon 01/22 12:22 PM
Joint Document Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-] 35 Notice of Hearing
Saturday, January 06, 2024
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/06 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, January 04, 2024
35 35 court Notice of Hearing Thu 01/04 2:55 PM
Notice of Trial Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Telephonic Hearing to be held on 1/29/2024 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C for1 , . Written Report due by 1/22/2024 for1 , (jc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 19, 2023
34 34 order Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order Thu 10/19 3:27 PM
Minutes of Proceeding. Proceedings: Video Discovery Dispute Hearing Related [+]. Orders: On or before November 2, 2023, Sklar Exploration Co. shall produce operating expense documents as discussed in the hearing.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, October 13, 2023
33 33 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/13 5:06 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Related [+]. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-] 32 Document/Discovery or Support Document
32 32 misc Document/Discovery or Support Document Fri 10/13 4:59 PM
Document Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Sklar Exploration Company, LLC. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 10/12 3:26 PM
Status Report Filed by Charles Michael Rubio on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc. Related [+]. (Rubio, Charles)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing
Sunday, October 08, 2023
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/08 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing
Friday, October 06, 2023
29 29 court Court Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/06 4:22 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing. Number of notices mailed: 1 Date Mailed 10/6/2023 Related [+].
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Hearing
28 28 court Notice of Hearing Fri 10/06 4:00 PM
Notice of Hearing On Discovery Dispute. Hearing to be held on 10/19/2023 at 02:45 PM Courtroom C. The parties shall follow the procedure set forth in Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1(d), with the required report due on or before October 13, 2023. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
27 27 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 09/20 3:12 PM
Order Denying Motion Related [+]. THIS MATTER comes before the Court on the Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed August 23, 2023 (the Motion), which the Court deems a motion to reconsider its Fourth Amended Scheduling Order forPre-Trial Deadlines dated August 23, 2023. The Court finds there is not adequatecause to grant the requested relief. Accordingly, THE COURT DENIES the Motion.
Related: [-] 26 Response
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
26 26 answer Response Wed 08/30 1:10 PM
Opposition Response Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-] 24 Motion
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
25 25 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Wed 08/23 3:39 PM
Fourth Amended Scheduling Order For Pre-Trial Deadlines Related [+]. Discovery due by 10/18/2023, Dispositive Motion due 12/29/2023 for24 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set, if necessary, after expiration of all pretrial deadlines and after the Court has ruled upon any dispositive motions, or upon request of all parties.
Related: [-] 24 Motion
Thursday, August 17, 2023
24 24 motion Motion Thu 08/17 3:19 PM
Motion Amend Scheduling Order Filed by Charles Michael Rubio on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc.. (Rubio, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charles Rubio
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Emails
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Emails
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Emails
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Subpoena
Att: 6 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
court Notice of Judge Reassignment (Batch) Wed 06/28 3:46 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. Judge Michael E. Romero added to case. Involvement of Judge Elizabeth E. Brown, terminated. This reassignment is for internal purposes only. Any hearing currently scheduled may be rescheduled. A separate notice will be issued if a hearing is rescheduled. Any pleadings in this matter must display the initials MER after the case number. . (pt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
23 23 order Vacate Hearing Fri 04/07 2:07 PM
Third Amended Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 22 Motion
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
22 22 motion Motion Wed 04/05 12:34 PM
Motion Joint Motion for Third Amended Scheduling Order Filed by Charles Michael Rubio on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc.. (Rubio, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, April 03, 2023
21 21 order Set Hearing (Adversary) Mon 04/03 2:54 PM
Order and Notice of Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference RE: Related [+]. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is set for a pretrial conference on a trailing docket before Judge Elizabeth E. Brown on Monday, April 17, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom F.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
20 20 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 11/23 2:55 PM
Second Amended Scheduling Order For Pre-Trial Deadlines Related [+]. Dispositive Motion due 3/31/2023 for1 , (sd)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,19 Motion
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
19 19 motion Motion Tue 11/22 9:30 AM
Motion Joint Motion for Second Amended Scheduling Order Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 14 7016 Scheduling Order,18 Other Order
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
18 18 order Other Order Wed 09/28 12:11 PM
First Amended Scheduling Order For Pre-Trial Deadlines Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 17 Motion
Monday, September 26, 2022
17 17 motion Motion Mon 09/26 4:48 PM
Motion For Amended Scheduling Order Filed by Charles Michael Rubio on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc. Related [+]. (Rubio, Charles)
Related: [-] 14 7016 Scheduling Order
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
16 16 answer Response Wed 06/29 5:08 PM
Response Filed by Charles Michael Rubio on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc. Related [+]. (Rubio, Charles)
Related: [-] 12 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Sunday, June 26, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/26 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 7016 Scheduling Order
Friday, June 24, 2022
14 14 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Fri 06/24 4:12 PM
7016 Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines. Related [+]. Discovery due by 11/30/2022 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 1/3/2023 for1 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, June 19, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/19 10:12 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Friday, June 17, 2022
12 12 order Compliance With Rules Fri 06/17 9:21 AM
Order For Compliance To Attorney Charles M. Rubio Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 7/5/2022 for11 , (jc)
Related: [-] 11 7026f Report
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
11 11 misc 7026 (f) Report Wed 06/15 1:52 PM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 9 Order to File
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, May 16, 2022
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1) Mon 05/16 12:35 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Corporate Parents Added to Case: Capstar Holding, LLC, Oil States Energy Services Holding, Inc., Oil States International, Inc.. Filed by R. J. Shannon on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc.. (Shannon, R. J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
9 9 order File Fri 05/13 8:12 AM
Order For Compliance With Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) Related [+]. Written Report due by 6/13/2022 for1 , (jc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, May 12, 2022
8 8 answer Response Thu 05/12 4:22 PM
Response Filed by R. J. Shannon on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc. Related [+]. (Shannon, R. J.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
7 7 order Compliance With Rules Wed 04/27 11:16 AM
Order For Compliance To Attorney R.J. Shannon Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 5/11/2022 for5 , (jc)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint
6 6 order Compliance With Rules Wed 04/27 11:13 AM
Order For Compliance With Federal Rules Of Procedure Rule 7007.1 And Local Bankruptcy Rule 9010-1 Or Other Applicable Rule Of Procedure Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 5/11/2022 for5 , (jc)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/26 2:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by R. J. Shannon on behalf of Capstar Drilling, Inc. Related [+]. (Shannon, R. J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 07, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 04/07 2:07 PM
Summons Service Executed On: CAPSTAR DRILLING, INC. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01077 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/28 8:36 PM
Summons Issued on Capstar Drilling, Inc. Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/28 8:33 PM
Adversary case 22-01077 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Capstar Drilling, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]