Kim v. Fuelman, a Division of Fleetcor Technologies Opera
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01078 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Fuelman, a Division of Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/30 6:44 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01078 EEB Closed. (jc) |
||
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 06/15 7:10 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01078 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc) |
||
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Tue 06/14 10:12 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
File
Thu 06/02 2:29 PM
Order To Show Cause . Document due by 6/23/2021 for1 , (sd) |
|
Sunday, May 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/01 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Compliance With Rules
Fri 04/29 3:32 PM
Order For Compliance To Attorney Sean C. Kirk . Rules Compliance due by 5/13/2022 (jc) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/14 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/12 3:41 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fuelman, a Division of Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC Answer Due 5/27/2022 . (jc) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/12 1:52 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/07 2:14 PM
Summons Service Executed On: FUELMAN, A DIVISION OF FLEETCOR TECHNOLOGIES OPERATING COMPANY, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01078 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 03/28 8:53 PM
Summons Issued on Fuelman, a Division of Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/28 8:52 PM
Adversary case 22-01078 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Fuelman, a Division of Fleetcor Technologies Operating Company, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |