Kim v. RWLS, LLC d/b/a Renegade Services
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01081 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
RWLS, LLC d/b/a Renegade Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/29 7:18 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01081 EEB Closed. (jc) |
||
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 04/21 9:54 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01081 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc) |
||
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed On: RWLS, LLC d/b/a Renegade Services Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01081 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on RWLS, LLC d/b/a Renegade Services Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01081 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against RWLS, LLC d/b/a Renegade Services. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |