Kim v. Slickline South, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01082 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Slickline South, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 09/23 12:33 PM
Receipt of Request for Exemplification of Document([LINK 22-01082 EEB] ) [misc,reqexema] ( 23.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31536294. Fee amount 23.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Request for Exemplification of Document (fee)
Fri 09/23 12:32 PM
Exemplification Request for Fee Amount $23 Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Document/Discovery or Support Document
Fri 09/23 8:46 AM
Certificate of Judgment for Lien Upon Land and Tenements (Abstract/Transcript of Judgment) . (mmm) |
|
16 | 16
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 09/23 6:46 AM
Receipt of Request for Certification of Document (fee)([LINK 22-01082 EEB] ) [misc,certcopa] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31534778. Fee amount 11.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Request for Certification of Document (fee)
Fri 09/23 6:45 AM
Certification Request for Judgment at Docket Number 12. Send Certified Document(s) to nan.sauter@diamondmccarthy.com Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 09/19 7:22 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01082 EEB Closed. (jc) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 09/02 3:22 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01082 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (jc) |
||
Saturday, August 13, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/13 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/13/2022. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/13 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/13/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment for AP Case
Thu 08/11 11:27 AM
Judgment . (sd) |
|
11 | 11
order
Default Judgment
Thu 08/11 11:15 AM
Order Granting Creditor Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment Against Slickline South, LLC . (sd) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/26 7:02 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 07/26 7:01 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Slickline South, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Crisp Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Johnson Affidavit | ||
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Att: 4 Other Judgment | ||
Sunday, June 26, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/26 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Virtual Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 06/24 8:39 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To Slickline South, LLC . (jc) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/22 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 06/22 12:34 PM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/07 3:01 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Slickline South, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01082 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 03/28 10:00 PM
Summons Issued on Slickline South, LLC Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/28 9:59 PM
Adversary case 22-01082 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Slickline South, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |