Kim v. T&T Welding, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01084 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
T&T Welding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Tue 10/24 9:06 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Loden, Stephen) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice
Mon 10/23 1:01 PM
Notice Re: Satisfaction of Judgment. Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Loden, Stephen) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 09/23 12:35 PM
Receipt of Request for Exemplification of Document([LINK 22-01084 EEB] ) [misc,reqexema] ( 23.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31536310. Fee amount 23.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Request for Exemplification of Document (fee)
Fri 09/23 12:34 PM
Exemplification Request for Fee Amount $23 Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Document/Discovery or Support Document
Fri 09/23 8:48 AM
Certificate of Judgment for Lien Upon Land and Tenements (Abstract/Transcript of Judgment) . (mmm) |
|
15 | 15
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 09/23 6:49 AM
Receipt of Request for Certification of Document (fee)([LINK 22-01084 EEB] ) [misc,certcopa] ( 11.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31534786. Fee amount 11.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Request for Certification of Document (fee)
Fri 09/23 6:48 AM
Certification Request for Judgment at Docket Number 11. Send Certified Document(s) to nan.sauter@diamondmccarthy.com Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 07/18 8:46 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01084 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Sunday, July 03, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/03 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/03 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment for AP Case
Fri 07/01 2:44 PM
Judgment For Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim Against Defendant T&T Welding, Inc. . (sd) |
|
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment
Fri 07/01 2:38 PM
Order Granting Creditor Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment Against T&T Welding, Inc. . (sd) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 07/01 2:46 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01084 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/15/2022. (sd) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/10 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 06/10 1:41 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against T&T Welding, Inc. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit D. Brian Crisp Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Christopher Johnson Affidavit | ||
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 4 Other Proposed Judgment | ||
Saturday, May 14, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/14 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/14/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
Virtual Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 05/12 3:41 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To T&T Welding, Inc. . (jc) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 05/11 9:49 AM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/14 1:51 PM
Summons Service Executed On: T&T Welding, Inc. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01084 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 03/28 10:28 PM
Summons Issued on T&T Welding, Inc. Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/28 10:27 PM
Adversary case 22-01084 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against T&T Welding, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |