Kim v. Stratum Reservoir, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01086 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Stratum Reservoir, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/12 12:02 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01086 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 07/28 8:52 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01086 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 8/11/2022. (sd) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Wed 07/27 12:52 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
File
Fri 07/08 3:04 PM
Order To Show Cause . Document due by 7/29/2022 for1 , (sd) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Document/Support Document
Tue 05/03 12:49 PM
Notice of Compliance of Jason Buchman per LBR 9010-1(b)(2) Filed by Jason Buchman on behalf of Stratum Reservoir, LLC. (Buchman, Jason) |
|
Saturday, April 23, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/23 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/23 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Compliance With Rules
Thu 04/21 12:11 PM
Order Regarding Compliance With Rules . Rules Compliance due by 5/5/2022 for5 , (sd) |
|
6 | 6
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/21 11:38 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Stratum Reservoir, LLC. Stratum Reservoir, LLC Answer Due 6/28/2022 . (sd) |
|
Tuesday, April 19, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/19 10:24 AM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/14 2:04 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Stratum Reservoir, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 11:12 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01086 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31195153. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 03/28 10:55 PM
Summons Issued on Stratum Reservoir, LLC Answer Due 04/27/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/28 10:50 PM
Adversary case 22-01086 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Stratum Reservoir, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/26/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |