Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust v. Stoneham Drilling Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01089 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Stoneham Drilling Corporation
Attn: James B. Bailey 1819 Fifth Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/06 10:28 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01089 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 02/17 10:23 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-1089 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 3/3/2023. (sd) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Wed 02/15 1:58 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/03 3:11 PM
Order Approving Eleventh Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 3/3/2023 . (sd) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/02 12:06 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order APPROVING ELEVENTH STIPULATION BY AND BETWEEN CREDITOR TRUSTEE AND STONEHAM DRILLING CORPORATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO ANSWER COMPLAINT | ||
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/05 12:25 PM
Order Approving Tenth Stipulation By And Between Creditor Trustee And Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 2/3/2023 . (sd) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/04 11:28 AM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Approving Tenth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/30 7:02 AM
Order Approving Ninth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 1/4/2023 . (sd) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/28 1:45 PM
Ninth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To File Answer Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) Modified on 11/29/2022 (sd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Approving Ninth Stipulation | ||
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/27 12:00 PM
Order Approving Eighth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 11/30/2022 . (sd) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/26 11:49 AM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/03 11:23 AM
Order Approving Seventh Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 10/31/2022 . (sd) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/30 1:07 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Approving Seventh Stipulation | ||
22 | 22
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Fri 09/30 11:55 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. James Bailey is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 21: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Adversary > Motion > Extend Time To File Answer To Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 10/5/2022. (sd) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation
Fri 09/30 8:56 AM
Unopposed Stipulation Between Stoneham Drilling Corporation and Creditor Trustee Re: Deadline to Answer Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/31 2:27 PM
Order Approving Sixth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trsutee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer. Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 9/30/2022 . (sd) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/29 12:24 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Tuesday, August 16, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/16 7:10 AM
Order Approving Fifth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 8/30/2022 . (sd) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/15 4:01 PM
Fifth Stipulation by and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (sd) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stipulation
Fri 08/12 1:02 PM
Stipulation Between Stoneham Drilling Corporation and Thomas M. Kim Re: Extension of Deadline to Answer Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/01 1:18 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 8/15/2022 . (sd) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/29 1:00 PM
Fourth Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/01 8:20 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint. Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 8/1/2022 . (sd) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/30 9:03 AM
Third Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) Modified on 6/30/2022 (sd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/27 2:31 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 7/1/2022 . (jc) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/26 2:05 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/29 3:02 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Answer Due 6/1/2022 . (sd) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/29 11:16 AM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust, Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Approving Stipulation by and Between Creditor Trustee and Stoneham Drilling Corporation Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint | ||
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Thu 04/28 4:14 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. James Bailey is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 6: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the correct event: Adversary > Motion > Extend Time To File Answer To Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 5/3/2022. (sd) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Stipulation
Thu 04/28 3:47 PM
Docketed in error using the incorrect event. Refer to Doc. #8. Stipulation Between Stoneham Drilling Corporation and Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee Re: Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint Filed by James B. Bailey on behalf of Stoneham Drilling Corporation . (Bailey, James) Modified on 4/29/2022 (sd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order | ||
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Mon 04/04 5:28 PM
Waiver and Acceptance of Service on April 4, 2020 Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust. (Toft, Andrew) Modified on 4/5/2022 (sd) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 03/31 10:05 AM
Summons Issued on Stoneham Drilling Corporation Answer Due 05/2/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Wed 03/30 9:57 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Andrew Toft is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 1: Summons is incorrectly bundled with the Complaint. Plaintiff is to issue the summons using the following: Adversary Proceeding > Summons > Issue Auto Summons. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief.(Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 3/31/2022. (sd) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 3:49 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01089 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31196378. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/29 3:47 PM
Adversary case 22-01089 Complaint by Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust against Stoneham Drilling Corporation. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/27/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Other Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Other Summons for Issuance |