Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust v. GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01091 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Wednesday, January 04, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/04 8:00 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-01091 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 12/20 2:15 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01091 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 1/3/2023. (sd) |
||
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Tue 12/20 2:14 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (sd) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/19 10:41 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
26 (a) Disclosure
Wed 10/05 2:29 PM
F.R.C.P. 26 (a) Disclosure Filed by Steven T Mulligan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP . (Mulligan, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary)
Tue 05/31 4:15 PM
Scheduling Order For Pre-Trial Deadlines Pursuant To Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7016(b) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 (b)) RE: . Discovery due by 12/14/2022, Dispositive Motion due 1/27/2023, Amended Pleadings Document due by 8/8/2022, Expert Witnesses Disclosures and written reports documents due by 10/31/2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial date will be set, if necessary, after expiration of all pretrial deadlines and after the Court has ruled upon any dispositive motions or upon request of the parties. |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
7026 (f) Report
Thu 05/26 1:38 PM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
File
Mon 05/02 11:22 AM
Order for Compliance With Rule 7026, FED.R.BANKR.P. (Rule 26(f), FED.R.CIV.P.) . Document due by 6/1/2022 for1 , (sd) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/29 4:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Steven T Mulligan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP . (Mulligan, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Mon 04/18 3:24 PM
Summons Service Executed On: GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP on April 5, 2022 Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 03/30 5:27 PM
Summons Issued on GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Wed 03/30 10:06 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Andrew Toft is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 1: Summons is incorrectly bundled with the Complaint. Plaintiff is to issue the summons using the following: Adversary Proceeding > Summons > Issue Auto Summons. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 3/31/2022. (sd) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 4:24 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01091 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31196542. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/29 4:23 PM
Adversary case 22-01091 Complaint by Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust against GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/27/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding for Issuance |