Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust v. Mesa Fluids LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01092 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mesa Fluids LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/04 9:22 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-1092 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 09/19 1:03 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-1092 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 10/3/2022. (sd) |
||
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/09 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/09/2022. (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/09 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/09/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 07, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment for AP Case
Wed 09/07 12:42 PM
Judgment . (sd) |
|
19 | 19
order
Default Judgment
Wed 09/07 12:37 PM
Order Granting Creditor Trustee's Motion Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P.55(b) and L.B.R. 7055-1(b) For Entry Of Default Judgment Against Defendant Mesa Fluids LLC . (sd) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/22 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Saturday, August 20, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 08/20 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/20/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
court
Returned Mail
Fri 08/19 2:20 PM
Returned Mail For Aaron Wallace Merrell, Mesa Fluids LLC Regarding Clerk's Entry of Default As To Mesa Fluids LLC . (jc) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
order
Compliance With Rules
Thu 08/18 11:29 AM
Order for Compliance Regarding Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 55(B) and L.B.R. 7055-1(B) for Entry of Default Judgment Against Mesa Fluids LLC . Rules Compliance due by 9/1/2022 for14 , (jc) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 08/03 1:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Mesa Fluids LLC Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order Order Granting Motion | ||
Att: 3 Proposed/Unsigned Order Proposed Order Entering Judgment | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
court
Court Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/02 7:04 AM
Court Certificate of Mailing. Number of notices mailed: 1 Date Mailed 8/2/22 . (sd) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
court
Returned Mail
Fri 07/29 3:37 PM
Returned Mail For Aaron Wallace Merrell, Mesa Fluids LLC Regarding Clerk's Entry of Default As To Mesa Fluids LLC . (sd) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/23 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Virtual Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 06/21 12:47 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default As To Mesa Fluids LLC . (sd) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 06/15 12:33 PM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
File
Thu 06/09 4:25 PM
Order Regarding Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default. . Document due by 6/23/2022 for7 , (sd) |
|
Tuesday, June 07, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 06/07 10:36 AM
Motion For Clerk's Entry of Default Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
order
File
Tue 05/17 10:52 AM
Order To Show Cause . Document due by 6/7/2022 for1 , (sd) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Mon 04/18 11:40 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Mesa Fluids LLC March 31, 2022 Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 03/30 5:31 PM
Summons Issued on Mesa Fluids LLC Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Wed 03/30 10:08 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Andrew Toft is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 1: Summons is incorrectly bundled with the Complaint. Plaintiff is to issue the summons using the following: Adversary Proceeding > Summons > Issue Auto Summons. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 3/31/2022. (sd) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/29 4:41 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01092 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31196644. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/29 4:40 PM
Adversary case 22-01092 Complaint by Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust against Mesa Fluids LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/27/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Summons for Issuance |