Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01095
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2022
Terminated:Jun 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Quitman Tank Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Quitman Tank Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/01 2:55 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01095 EEB Closed. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/17 4:26 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01095 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 5/31/2022. (sd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Fri 05/13 1:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 14, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 04/14 2:24 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Quitman Tank Solutions, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 03/31 12:06 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01095 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31201565. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/30 2:49 PM
Summons Issued on Quitman Tank Solutions, LLC Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/30 2:48 PM
Adversary case 22-01095 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Quitman Tank Solutions, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/28/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]