Kim v. KCS Automation, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01098 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
KCS Automation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 12/20 2:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01098 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 1/3/2023. (sd) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/20 2:25 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01098 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulation
Fri 12/02 1:03 PM
Agreed Judgment And Order In Favor Of The Creditor Trustee Against KCS Automation. . (sd) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Wed 11/30 7:13 AM
Joint Stipulation Between Thomas M. Kim and KCS Automation, LLC Re: Judgment in Favor of Trustee Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Agreed Judgment and Order | ||
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
order
7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary)
Fri 07/08 2:54 PM
Scheduling Order For Pre-Trial Deadlines: . Dispositive Motion due 1/3/2023 for1 , Document due by 7/22/2022 for1 , Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2022 for1 , (sd) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
7026 (f) Report
Wed 07/06 1:07 PM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
File
Fri 06/03 8:41 AM
Order for Compliance With Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) . Document due by 7/5/2022 for1 , (sd) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/01 2:48 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Matthew D. Skeen Jr. on behalf of KCS Automation, LLC . (Skeen, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/03 3:21 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint for Defendant KCS Automation, LLC. Answer Due 6/1/2022 . (mmg) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/03 9:07 AM
Corrected Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Matthew D. Skeen Jr. on behalf of KCS Automation, LLC . (Skeen, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
6 | 6
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Tue 05/03 7:32 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Matthew Skeen is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 5: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Adversary > Motion > Extend Time To File Answer To Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 5/6/2022. (sd) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time (Adversary)
Mon 05/02 4:43 PM
Docketed in error using the incorrect event. Refer to Doc. #7 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To June 1, 2022 Filed by Matthew D. Skeen Jr. on behalf of KCS Automation, LLC. (Skeen, Matthew) Modified on 5/3/2022 (sd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/14 2:57 PM
Summons Service Executed On: KCS Automation, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 03/31 12:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01098 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31201565. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 03/30 3:33 PM
Summons Issued on KCS Automation, LLC Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/30 3:33 PM
Adversary case 22-01098 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against KCS Automation, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/28/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |