Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01099
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2022
Terminated:Sep 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scientific Drilling International, Inc.
Represented By
Scientific Drilling International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, September 01, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/01 10:30 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-1099 EEB Closed. (sd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 08/17 10:21 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01099 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 8/31/2022. (sd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Tue 08/16 10:41 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
16 16 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 07/26 9:43 AM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation Extending Time For Defendant Scientific Drilling International, Inc. to Respond To Original Complaint. Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Answer Due 8/24/2022 Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, July 25, 2022
15 15 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 07/25 10:37 AM
Fourth Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, June 27, 2022
14 14 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 06/27 3:09 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation Extending Time For Defendant Scientific Drilling International, Inc. To Respond To Original Complaint. Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Answer Due 7/25/2022 Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Friday, June 24, 2022
13 13 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 06/24 9:47 AM
Third Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, May 26, 2022
12 12 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 05/26 9:24 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Scientific Drilling International, Inc. to Respond to Original Complaint. Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Answer Due 6/24/2022 Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
11 11 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Wed 05/25 3:28 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
10 10 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Wed 05/25 1:32 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Megan Adeyemo is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 9: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the correct event: Adversary > Motion > Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. Tickle Due Date 5/31/2022. (sd)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
9 9 misc Stipulation (No Order Requested) Wed 05/25 12:29 PM
Second Stipulation Between Scientific Drilling International, Inc. and Plaintiff Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Scientific Drilling International, Inc.. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
8 8 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/26 3:48 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Answer Due 5/25/2022 Related [+]. (sd)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, April 25, 2022
7 7 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 04/25 9:20 AM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Related [+]. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
6 6 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Mon 04/25 7:59 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Megan M. Adeyemo is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 5: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. (jc)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Friday, April 22, 2022
5 5 misc Stipulation (No Order Requested) Fri 04/22 3:10 PM
Stipulation Between Scientific Drilling International, Inc. and Plaintiff Filed by Megan M. Adeyemo on behalf of Scientific Drilling International, Inc.. (Adeyemo, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, April 14, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 04/14 2:42 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 03/31 12:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01099 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31201565. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 03/30 3:42 PM
Summons Issued on Scientific Drilling International, Inc. Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/30 3:40 PM
Adversary case 22-01099 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Scientific Drilling International, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/28/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]