Kim v. Weatherford US, LP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01103 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Weatherford US, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/06 5:01 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01103 EEB Closed. (mjb) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial)
Fri 03/17 9:53 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
22 | 22
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Fri 03/17 9:38 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Christopher D. Johnson is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 21: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial). Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 3/24/2023. (mjb) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 03/17 3:27 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01103 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 3/31/2023 to review for closing. (mjb) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation (No Order Requested)
Thu 03/16 10:35 AM
Stipulation Between Thomas M. Kim and Weatherford U.S., L.P. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
order
7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary)
Wed 09/14 3:43 PM
Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines . Discovery due by 7/11/2023, Dispositive Motions due 9/1/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2023. (mjb) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Document/Discovery or Support Document
Wed 08/31 2:05 PM
(Proposed) Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines Filed by Timothy Aaron Million on behalf of Weatherford US, LP . (Million, Timothy) Modified on 9/1/2022 (mjb) |
|
18 | 18
misc
7026 (f) Report
Wed 08/31 1:59 PM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Timothy Aaron Million on behalf of Weatherford US, LP . (Million, Timothy) |
|
17 | 17
misc
7026 (f) Report
Wed 08/31 9:53 AM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines | ||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
order
File
Mon 08/01 11:18 AM
Order for Compliance with Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) . The parties to file by a written report by 8/31/2022. (mjb) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/28 2:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy Aaron Million on behalf of Weatherford US, LP . (Million, Timothy) |
|
Sunday, July 03, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/03 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/03/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, June 26, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/26 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/26 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/24 9:22 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Weatherford U.S., L.P.. . (jss) |
|
10 | 10
order
Compliance With Rules
Fri 06/24 9:19 AM
Order for Compliance to Attorney Timothy A. Million . Rules Compliance due by 7/8/2022 for1 , (jss) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/23 10:56 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/14 2:14 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Weatherford US, LP Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/12 1:45 PM
Order Approving First Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Weatherford U.S., L.P. Weatherford US, LP's Answer Due 6/28/2022 . (mjb) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/11 2:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Fri 04/08 2:01 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Christopher D. Johnson is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 4: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint (motion). Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 4/11/2022. (mjb) |
|
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation (No Order Requested)
Thu 04/07 11:06 AM
Stipulation Between Thomas M. Kim and Weatherford US, LP Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 03/31 12:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01103 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31201565. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 03/30 4:25 PM
Summons Issued on Weatherford US, LP Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/30 4:25 PM
Adversary case 22-01103 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Weatherford US, LP. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/28/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |