Kim v. Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01104 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 07/29 4:09 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01104 EEB Closed. (mjb) |
||
Thursday, July 07, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 07/07 11:52 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01104 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/21/2022 to review for closing. (mjb) |
||
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer)
Wed 07/06 1:05 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Saturday, May 28, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/28 10:12 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/28/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/26 7:42 AM
Order Approving Second Joint Stipulation to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint. Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC's Answer Due 6/30/2022 . (mjb) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/24 1:38 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Sunday, April 24, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/24 10:12 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Compliance With Rules
Fri 04/22 12:03 PM
Order For Compliance to Attorney William H. Patrick III . Rules Compliance due by 5/5/2022. (mjb) |
|
6 | 6
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/22 12:00 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC. Defendant's Answer Due 5/30/2022 . (mjb) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/21 8:15 AM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 04/14 3:02 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 03/31 12:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01104 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31201565. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 03/30 4:34 PM
Summons Issued on Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC Answer Due 04/29/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/30 4:32 PM
Adversary case 22-01104 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Moncla Workover & Drilling, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/28/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |