Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust v. Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01105 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Baker Hughes Company f/k/a Baker Hughes a GE company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Tuesday, December 13, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 12/13 4:17 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01105 EEB Closed. (mjb) |
||
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 11/28 10:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01105 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 12/12/2022 to review for closing. (mjb) |
||
Wednesday, November 23, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial)
Wed 11/23 8:28 AM
Joint Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Tue 11/22 10:11 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Andrew M. Toft is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 11: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Trial). Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 11/28/2022. (mjb) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation (No Order Requested)
Mon 11/21 10:33 AM
Joint Stipulation Between Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust and Defendants Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC et al. Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
26 (a) Disclosure
Wed 10/05 2:27 PM
F.R.C.P. 26 (a) Disclosure Filed by Steven T Mulligan on behalf of Baker Hughes Company f/k/a Baker Hughes a GE company, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC . (Mulligan, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary)
Tue 05/31 12:23 PM
Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7016(b)(Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b)) . Discovery due by 12/14/2022, Dispositive Motions due 1/27/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2022. (mjb) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
7026 (f) Report
Thu 05/26 1:40 PM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust . (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
File
Mon 05/02 2:38 PM
Order for Compliance with Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) . The parties' written report due by 6/1/2022. (mjb) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/29 4:18 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Steven T Mulligan on behalf of Baker Hughes Company f/k/a Baker Hughes a GE company, Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC . (Mulligan, Steven) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Mon 04/18 3:26 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Baker Hughes Company f/k/a Baker Hughes a GE company and Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC on April 5, 2022 Filed by Andrew M. Toft on behalf of Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 03/31 9:16 AM
Summons Issued on Baker Hughes Company f/k/a Baker Hughes a GE company Answer Due 05/2/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 03/31 9:14 AM
Summons Issued on Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC Answer Due 05/2/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 03/30 4:44 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01105 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31199623. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/30 4:42 PM
Adversary case 22-01105 Complaint by Thomas Kim, Trustee of the Sklar Creditors Trust against Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC, Baker Hughes Company f/k/a Baker Hughes a GE company. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/28/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Toft, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |