Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:22-ap-05052
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
ZJ Events LLC
591 Stewart Ave Suite 520
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
ZJ Events LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC, solely in its capacity as Plan Administrator of the GenCanna Wind-Down Trust
Represented By
Aaron L. Hammer
Horwood Marcus & Berk Chartered
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, January 12, 2024
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/12 10:01 AM
Adversary Proceeding 22-5052 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
18 18 order Remanding Wed 12/13 10:01 AM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 16 Order to Show Cause
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal (Adversary) Wed 11/22 2:11 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 order Show Cause Mon 11/13 4:15 PM
Order to Show Cause regarding lack of prosecution. Show Cause hearing to be held on 12/21/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
15 15 audio Audio File Thu 08/17 1:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/17/2023 9:06:29 AM ]. File Size [ 261 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:05 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Hearing Held Thu 08/17 12:33 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
court Hearing Set/Cont Wed 07/26 10:16 AM
Hearing continued on Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/25 2:02 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC Related [+]. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Thursday, July 20, 2023
12 12 court Hearing Held Thu 07/20 12:21 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (alf)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
11 11 audio Audio File Thu 07/20 12:15 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/20/2023 9:01:12 AM ]. File Size [ 103 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:26 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/19 2:28 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing for July 20, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. Filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC Related [+]. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
court Hearing Set/Cont Mon 06/19 6:38 PM
Hearing continued Related [+]. Hearing continued to 7/20/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (rah)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC
Thursday, May 11, 2023
9 9 order Remanding Thu 05/11 4:15 PM
Order Remanding Order and Striking Hearing Related [+] (bjp)
Related: [-] 4 Setting or Continuing Hearing
8 8 utility Status Report Thu 05/11 11:18 AM
Status Report, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
7 7 motion Default Judgment Wed 05/10 3:52 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against ZJ Events LLC, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 04, 2023
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 05/04 10:28 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default, ZJ Events LLC. (rah)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
5 5 motion Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 05/01 4:40 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
4 4 order Setting or Continuing Hearing Mon 05/01 2:34 PM
Order Setting Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 5/18/2023 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
3 3 court Summons Service Executed Tue 04/05 1:00 PM
Summons Service Executed. (Delman, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 01, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Fri 04/01 2:20 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/31 3:20 PM
Adversary case 22-05052 Complaint, filed by Oxford Restructuring Advisors LLC against ZJ Events LLC Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Hammer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A