Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas O Rice
Case #: 4:22-cv-05049
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983bv
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2022
Terminated:Nov 08, 2022
Case in other court:California Southern, 3:20-cv-01447
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 04, 2022 3:47 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Walla Walla
Represented By
Heather C Yakely
Kutak Rock Llp - Spokane
contact info
Richard B Jolley
Keating Bucklin & Mccormack Inc Ps
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe
Represented By
Heather C Yakely
Kutak Rock Llp - Spokane
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
Heather C Yakely
Kutak Rock Llp - Spokane
contact info
Defendant
Marcus Goodwater
Represented By
Heather C Yakely
Kutak Rock Llp - Spokane
contact info
Richard B Jolley
Keating Bucklin & Mccormack Inc Ps
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Morales
Represented By
Rebecca L. Wilson
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Alicia Mac
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Alicia Louise Mac
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Sarah E Elsden
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Heather C Yakely
Kutak Rock Llp - Spokane
contact info
Defendant
Walla Walla County
Represented By
Rebecca L. Wilson
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Alicia Mac
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Alicia Louise Mac
Attorney General Of Washington
contact info
Sarah E Elsden
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Heather C Yakely
Kutak Rock Llp - Spokane
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Torrescano
Represented By
William A Gilbert
Gilbert Law Firm Ps
contact info
Thomas E Robertson
Law Office Of Thomas E. Robertson
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2022
ORDER granting Defendants' 22 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
GPO Nov 08 2022
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (BF, Paralegal)
GPO Jan 09 2023
ORDER denying [ECF No. 30] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice.

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 30, 2023
42 42 appeal 9CCA Order (Act as Mandate) Mon 07/03 9:09 AM
COPY OF 9CCA ORDER as to37 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Torrescano. Appeal is Dismissed. 9CCA: 23-35100 (TNC, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
41 41 appeal 9CCA Notice of Appeal - Amended Wed 02/08 9:43 AM
9CCA AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to37 Notice of Appeal,35 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Michael Torrescano. 9CCA: 23-35100 (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
40 40 appeal 9CCA Time Schedule Tue 02/07 3:58 PM
9CCA Appeal Time Schedule and Case Number: 23-35100 for37 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Torrescano. Opening Brief Due: 4/7/2023. Appellees Brief Due: 5/8/2023. Mediation Questionnaire Due: 3/14/2023. (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
39 39 appeal Letter - Appeal Mon 02/06 5:15 PM
Letter from Appeal Deputy Clerk to William A. Gilbert dated February 6, 2023.(TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet
38 38 appeal 9CCA Payment Notification Mon 02/06 5:12 PM
9CCA Payment Notification form re ECF No.37 Notice of Appeal. Received $505, receipt number AWAEDC-4221688. (TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
37 37 appeal 9CCA Notice of Appeal Mon 02/06 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to ECF No.35 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Michael Torrescano. (TR, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
36 36 appeal 9CCA Lodged Notice of Appeal Mon 02/06 10:58 AM
LODGED NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to35 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AWAEDC-4221688. (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
35 35 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 01/09 12:52 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
34 34 respm Reply Memorandum Tue 01/03 3:50 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re30 MOTION for Reconsideration re28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Torrescano. (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
33 33 respm Response to Motion Tue 12/20 2:39 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re30 MOTION for Reconsideration re28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Walla Walla, Marcus Goodwater. (Jolley, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
32 32 notice Notice - Other Wed 11/30 2:20 PM
NOTICE by Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County of Withdrawal of Sarah E. Elsden as Counsel (Elsden, Sarah)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 11/30 10:21 AM
Order Directing Response to Plaintiff's30 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Torrescano. Defendants shall respond to the motion on or before 12/20/2022. Plaintiff's optional reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 1/3/2023. The motion will be considered without oral argument on 1/10/2023 . Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER - NO PDF ATTACHED. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
30 30 motion Reconsideration Tue 11/29 10:59 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Torrescano. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
29 29 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 11/08 4:15 PM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
28 28 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/08 4:13 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'22 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
27 27 notice Notice - Other Thu 10/27 4:29 PM
NOTICE by Michael Torrescano re23 Response to Motion Supplemental Authority (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
26 26 misc Amended/Corrected Document - NOT Complaint Tue 10/25 3:39 PM
CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by City of Walla Walla, Marcus Goodwater Re22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Description: Page 11 Corrected cites..(Jolley, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata
Monday, October 24, 2022
25 25 respm Reply Memorandum Mon 10/24 4:36 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Walla Walla, Marcus Goodwater. (Jolley, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
24 24 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/17 3:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental Response filed by Michael Torrescano. (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
23 23 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/10 2:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
22 22 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/19 3:11 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Yakely, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Saturday, July 30, 2022
21 21 order Scheduling Order Sat 07/30 9:14 AM
JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Pretrial Conference is set for 8/31/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. A Jury Trial is set for 9/11/2023 at 8:30 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Thomas O. Rice. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/26 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance BETH BOLLINGER by William A Gilbert on behalf of Michael Torrescano (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing - By Court Tue 07/26 9:35 AM
NOTICE RESETTING HEARING BY COURT **TIME ONLY**. Due to the Court's trial schedule, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2022 at 8:15 AM is RESET TO 7/27/2022 at 8:00 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The call-in instructions contained at ECF No. 15 remain the same. TEXT ONLY NOTICE; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Cancellation - By Court Tue 07/26 1:24 PM
NOTICE VACATING HEARING BY COURT. Due to the Court's trial schedule, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2022 is VACATED . A Jury Trial Scheduling Order is forthcoming. TEXT ONLY NOTICE; NO PDF ATTACHED. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
17 17 misc Status Report Wed 07/13 12:24 PM
STATUS REPORT JOINT by All Plaintiffs. (Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/17 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E Elsden on behalf of Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County (Attorney Sarah E Elsden added to party Michelle Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah E Elsden added to party Walla Walla County(pty:dft))(Elsden, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
15 15 3 pgs order Order Thu 06/09 11:52 AM
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/27/2022 at 8:15 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The parties' Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 7/13/2022 . Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/21 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B Jolley on behalf of City of Walla Walla, Marcus Goodwater (Attorney Richard B Jolley added to party City of Walla Walla(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B Jolley added to party Marcus Goodwater(pty:dft))(Jolley, Richard)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Amended/Corrected Document - NOT Complaint Thu 04/21 4:02 PM
CORRECTED DOCUMENT filed by Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County Re12 Attorney Withdrawal & Substitution,. Description: Wrong party selected in original filing. (Yakely, Heather)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Attorney Withdrawal & Substitution Thu 04/21 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants City of Walla Walla, Michelle Morales. Attorney Alicia L. Mac and Rebecca Wilson is withdrawing. Heather C Yakely is substituted as counsel for Defendants. (Attorney Heather C Yakely added to party City of Walla Walla(pty:dft), Attorney Heather C Yakely added to party Michelle Morales(pty:dft))(Yakely, Heather) See corrected document filed at ECF No. 13 Modified on 4/21/2022 (SG, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
10 10 notice Attorney Withdrawal & Substitution Wed 04/13 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Torrescano. Attorney Thomas E Robertson is withdrawing. William A Gilbert is substituted as counsel for Plaintiff. (Attorney William A Gilbert added to party Michael Torrescano(pty:pla))(Gilbert, William)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/13 1:01 PM
ORDER denying as moot7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 04/07 2:47 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 04/06 5:38 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01447. Docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
8 8 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Washington. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Washington*.*920 W. Riverside Ave**Spokane, WA 99201*. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/30/2021. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfer Order
Thursday, October 01, 2020
7 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14607786.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gilbert, William) QC mail sent re improper form on 10/1/2020, instructed to re-file using Court form without re-paying (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
6 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION to Quash For Lack of Jurisdiction And/Or In The Alternative Motion For Removal filed by City of Walla Walla, Marcus Goodwater, Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County.(Mac, Alicia). QC email: Exceeds pager limits per Civ. L.R. 7.1(h). No refile (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alicia Dragoo,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-B
Monday, September 21, 2020
5 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Quash For Lack of Jurisdiction And/Or In The Alternative Motion For Removal filed by Michael Torrescano.(Robertson, Thomas) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of William Gilbert,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Declaration of Michael Torrescano
Thursday, August 27, 2020
4 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County of case(s) US District Court ED of Washington; 4:19-cv-5254-TOR; Anthony Haworth v. Walla Walla County, et al. .(Mac, Alicia). QC email: separate motion required. Atty not associated with party (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B
Monday, August 24, 2020
3 3 MOTION to Quash For Lack of Jurisdiction And/Or In The Alternative Motion For Removal by Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County.(Wilson, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca L. Wilson added to party Michelle Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca L. Wilson added to party Walla Walla County(pty:dft) (jdt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michelle Morales,
Att: 2 Declaration of Marcus Goodwater
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
2 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Walla Walla, John/Jane Doe(agents of Walla Walla County), John/Jane Doe(agents of City of Walla Walla), Marcus Goodwater, Michelle Morales, Walla Walla County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14229621.), filed by Michael Torrescano. The new case number is 3:20-cv-1447-W-LL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Robertson, Thomas)(smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/6/2022.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet