Original Case: 4:22-cv-05049

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-35100
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2023
Terminated:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 04, 2023 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
MARCUS GOODWATER
Represented By
Heather C. Yakely
Evans, Craven & Lackie, PS
contact info
Richard Brooks Jolley
Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc., PS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF WALLA WALLA
Represented By
Heather C. Yakely
Evans, Craven & Lackie, PS
contact info
Richard Brooks Jolley
Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc., PS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN AND JANE DOES, agents or employees of City of Walla Walla
Represented By
Heather C. Yakely
Evans, Craven & Lackie, PS
contact info
Richard Brooks Jolley
Keating Bucklin & McCormack, Inc., PS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WALLA WALLA COUNTY
Represented By
Heather C. Yakely
Evans, Craven & Lackie, PS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHELLE MORALES
Represented By
Heather C. Yakely
Evans, Craven & Lackie, PS
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN AND JANE DOES, agents or employees of Walla Walla County
Represented By
Heather C. Yakely
Evans, Craven & Lackie, PS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL TORRESCANO
Represented By
William A. Gilbert
Gilbert Law Firm
contact info
Beth Mary Bollinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/04/2023 1:26 AM PDT
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Michael Torrescano Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/14/2023. Appellant Michael Torrescano opening brief due 04/07/2023. Appellees City of Walla Walla, Marcus Goodwater, John And Jane Does, Michelle Morales and Walla Walla County answering brief due 05/08/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12648250] (RT) [Entered: 02/07/2023 02:30 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet