Roland et al v. Letgo, Inc. et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00899 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2022 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 11, 2022 3:06 AM MDT |
Defendant
Letgo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OfferUp, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Bilbrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gina Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Madison Roland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sammy J. Boumadi-Heckerman
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 05 2022
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5 December 2022.(cmadr, ) |