Roland, et al v. Letgo, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00899
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cv-01012 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2024 2:05 AM MST |
Defendant
DOES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
OFFERUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
LETGO, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROSA BILBREY, as personal representative of the Estate of Joseph Roland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MADISON ROLAND, individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
GINA HARRIS, as legal guardian to Layla Roland, Joseph Roland, Mason Roland, and Lily Roland, minor children of and legal heirs to Joseph and Jossline Roland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMMI HECKERMAN, as personal representative of Decedant, Estate of Jossline Roland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/04/2024 2:05 AM MST |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
[10968502] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/10/2023. Docketing statement due 01/25/2023 for Letgo, Inc. Transcript order form due 01/25/2023 for Letgo, Inc. Notice of appearance due on 01/25/2023 for Rosa Bilbrey, Gina Harris, Sammi Heckerman, Letgo, Inc. and Madison Roland. Disclosure statement due on 01/25/2023 for Letgo, Inc. 23-1012 | ||
Att: 1 29 pgs Transmittal letter and preliminary record | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil | ||
5 pgs [10968747] Rule 26 Disclosure Statement filed by Offerup, Inc. in 22-1456 More than 50 parties disclosed: no. Served on 01/11/2023. Manner of Service: email. 22-1456 23-1012 MMA |