Planet Gadget USA, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:14-bk-10142
Lead case is: 8:14-bk-10142
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | K Rodney May |
Case #: | 8:14-bk-10163 |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 15, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Dec 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Planet Gadget USA, LLC, Debtor
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP c/o Jay Verona 101 E. Kennedy Blvd Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Planet Gadget USA, LLC
8108 Krauss Blvd Ste 110
Tampa, FL 33619-3009 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 4:17 PM EDT |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Assignment of the Honorable K. Rodney May, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.) |
||
court
Receipt of Full Filing Fee (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)
Fri 08/29 5:19 PM
Receipt of Full Filing Fee. Receipt Number 115714, Fee Amount $1,717.00. (Dkt) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Fri 08/29 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Planet Gadget USA, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/29/2014 Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2014 (Verona, Jay) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Planet Gadget USA, LLC. (Verona, Jay) |
|
3 | 3
![]() List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Planet Gadget USA, LLC. (Verona, Jay) |
|
4 | 4
![]() List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Planet Gadget USA, LLC. (Verona, Jay) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 14-10142 with 14-10161 14-10151 14-10144 14-10176 14-10180 14-10178 14-10181 14-10185 14-10189 14-10182 14-10193 14-10183 14-10149 14-10173 14-10175 14-10171 14-10167 14-10164 14-10165 14-10196 Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor Planet Gadget USA, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo) |