Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:14-bk-10142
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jan 23, 2015
Claims Deadline:Apr 23, 2015
Converted:Dec 16, 2014
Terminated:Mar 09, 2018

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
CRS Holding of America, LLC, Debtor
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP c./o Jay Verona, Esq. 101 E. Kennedy Blvd Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Hugo S deBeaubien
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLP
contact info
Jay B Verona
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Debtor
CRS Holding of America, LLC, et al
(Jointly Administered) 8108 Krauss Blvd., Suite 110
Tampa, FL 33619
Represented By
Hugo S deBeaubien
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLP
contact info
Jay B Verona
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gerard A. McHale, Jr.
1601 Jackson Street Suite 200
Fort Myers, FL 33901
Represented By
Michael C Markham, Attorney for Trustee
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Angelina E Lim, Attorney for Trustee
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Michael C Markham
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Trustee
Gerard A McHale, Jr
McHale PA 1601 Jackson St. Suite 200
Fort Myers, FL 33901
Represented By
Michael C Markham, Attorney for Trustee
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Angelina E Lim, Attorney for Trustee
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
Michael C Markham
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Nicole Peair
Timberlake Annex
contact info
Benjamin E. Lambers
Timberlake Annex
contact info


1. FBI investigating Creative Recycling Systems (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Wed 08/12/2015
2. Creative Recycling Systems files for voluntary Chapter 7 liquidation (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Mon 12/22/2014
Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 4:13 PM EDT
Friday, August 29, 2014
assign Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Assignment of the Honorable K. Rodney May, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.)
Related: [-]
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Courtroom Deputy Use Fri 08/29 4:56 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled Related [+] This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Hugo deBeaubien is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. . Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2014 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Denise G.)
Related: [-] Motion for Joint Administration, Motion to Use Cash Collateral, Generic Motion, Generic Motion, Generic Motion, Motion to Extend Time, Generic Motion, Motion to Obtain Credit11 ,13 ,15 ,19 ,17 ,21 ,6 ,9
court Receipt of Full Filing Fee (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Fri 08/29 5:18 PM
Receipt of Full Filing Fee. Receipt Number 115713, Fee Amount $1,717.00. (Dkt)
Related: [-]
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 08/29 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 08/29 10:17 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of CRS Holding of America, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/29/2014 Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2014 (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 08/29 10:19 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 08/29 10:20 AM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 08/29 10:43 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Fri 08/29 10:45 AM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion for Joint Administration Fri 08/29 10:52 AM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of with Affliated Case Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate Of Necessity Fri 08/29 10:53 AM
Certificate of Necessity for Debtors' Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 motion Application to Employ/Retain Fri 08/29 10:57 AM
Application to Employ Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick as Counsel Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion to Use Cash Collateral Fri 08/29 11:09 AM
Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate Of Necessity Fri 08/29 11:10 AM
Certificate of Necessity Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
Emergency Motion to Reject Leases Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate Of Necessity
Certificate of Necessity for Debtor's Emergency Motion to Reject Leases Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
Emergency Motion for Order Directing Continuation of Utility Services and Determining Adequate Protection Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate Of Necessity
Certificate of Necessity for Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order Directing Continuation of Utility Services and Determinig Adequete Protection Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 13
15 15 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
Emergency Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate Of Necessity
Certificate of Necessity for Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 15
17 17 motion Motion to Extend Time
Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Payment of Administrative Rent Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Certificate Of Necessity
Certificate of Necessity for Debtor's Emergency Motion to Extend Time for Payment of Administrative Rent Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 17
19 19 motion Z - Generic Motion (use only when there is no specific motion event)
Emergency Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary Course Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Certificate Of Necessity
Certificate of Necessity for Debtor's Emergency Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary Course Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 19
21 21 motion Motion to Obtain Credit
Emergency Motion to Obtain Credit Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate Of Necessity
Certificate of Necessity for Debtor's Emergency Motion to Obtain Credit Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 21
23 23 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/29 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by W Keith Fendrick on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank. (Fendrick, W)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/29 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Noel R Boeke on behalf of Creditor Regions Bank. (Boeke, Noel)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/29 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nathan A Carney on behalf of Creditor JY Creative Holdings, Inc.. (Carney, Nathan)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice Of Hearing Fri 08/29 5:02 PM
Notice of Hearing on Emergency First Day Motions Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/3/2014 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-] 11 ,13 ,15 ,8 ,19 ,17 ,21 ,6 ,9
28 28 motion Motion to Assume or Reject Lease/Executory Contract Tue 09/02 12:58 PM
Motion to Reject Leases Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor CRS Holding of America, LLC Related [+]. (Pamella)
Related: [-] 11