Member Case
Lead case is: 8:14-bk-10142

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:K Rodney May
Case #: 8:14-bk-10183
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Oct 15, 2014
Claims Deadline:Dec 29, 2014
Terminated:Aug 26, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC, Debtor
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP c/o Jay Verona 101 E. Kennedy Blvd Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Jay B Verona
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Hugo S deBeaubien
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLP
contact info
Debtor
Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC
8108 Krauss Blvd Ste 110
Tampa, FL 33619-3009
Represented By
Jay B Verona
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Hugo S deBeaubien
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Nicole Peair
Timberlake Annex
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 2:58 PM EDT
Friday, August 29, 2014
assign Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Assignment of the Honorable K. Rodney May, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.)
Related: [-]
court Receipt of Full Filing Fee (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Fri 08/29 5:22 PM
Receipt of Full Filing Fee. Receipt Number 115719, Fee Amount $1,717.00. (Dkt)
Related: [-]
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 08/29 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/29/2014 Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2014 (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC. (Verona, Jay)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Motion for Joint Administration
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 14-10142 with 14-10161 14-10151 14-10144 14-10176 14-10180 14-10178 14-10181 14-10185 14-10189 14-10182 14-10193 14-10183 14-10149 14-10173 14-10175 14-10171 14-10167 14-10164 14-10165 14-10196 Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of Tennessee, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo)
Related: [-]