Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:14-bk-10142
Lead case is: 8:14-bk-10142
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | K Rodney May |
Case #: | 8:14-bk-10189 |
Case Filed: | Aug 29, 2014 |
Creditor Meeting: | Oct 15, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Dec 29, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC, Debtor
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick, LLP c/o Jay Verona 101 E. Kennedy Blvd Suite 2800
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC
8108 Krauss Blvd Ste 110
Tampa, FL 33619-3009 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 2:57 PM EDT |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
assign
Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases
Assignment of the Honorable K. Rodney May, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.) |
||
court
Receipt of Full Filing Fee (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)
Fri 08/29 5:22 PM
Receipt of Full Filing Fee. Receipt Number 115720, Fee Amount $1,717.00. (Dkt) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Fri 08/29 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules A-J and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/29/2014 Disclosure Statement due by 12/29/2014 (Verona, Jay) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC. (Verona, Jay) |
|
3 | 3
![]() List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC. (Verona, Jay) |
|
4 | 4
![]() List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Jay B Verona on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC. (Verona, Jay) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 14-10142 with 14-10161 14-10151 14-10144 14-10176 14-10180 14-10178 14-10181 14-10185 14-10189 14-10182 14-10193 14-10183 14-10149 14-10173 14-10175 14-10171 14-10167 14-10164 14-10165 14-10196 Filed by Hugo S deBeaubien on behalf of Debtor Creative Recycling Systems of North Florida, LLC (deBeaubien, Hugo) |