Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:21-bk-01416

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:22-ap-00082
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:May 02, 2022
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
David G. Hellweg
PO Box 15066
Sarasota, FL 34277
Represented By
David G. Hellweg
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Amos-King
5100 W. Kennedy Blvd., Ste. 120
Tampa, FL 33609
Represented By
Andrew W Lennox
Lennox Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/04 2:44 PM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-82 Closed. (Tina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
33 33 misc Proof of Service (AP) Tue 09/24 4:28 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Judgment by Default. Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King Related [+]. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-] 32
32 32 order Default Judgment Tue 09/24 7:28 AM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Service Instructions: Andrew Lennox is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 29
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
31 31 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 09/04 1:13 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Harry Haskins, Angela Grewal, Bernard Morse, Kathleen DiSanto, Daniel Etlinger, Andrew Lennox WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew) Doc #29 - Granted in part, denied as to count 1 O/Lennox Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 08/23 1:51 PM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue . (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-] 29
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Fri 08/23 11:35 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 09/04/2024 10:30 am Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion for Default Judgment Doc29 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Andrew W Lennox to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Adversary_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 29
Friday, August 02, 2024
29 29 motion Motion for Default Judgment Fri 08/02 5:10 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Filing (AP) Fri 08/02 5:09 PM
Notice of Filing Sworn Statement in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Reassignment of Lead Atty or Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Fri 05/12 10:38 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Tue 11/01 10:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 10/27/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #26 )
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
26 26 court Clerks Entry of Default Tue 10/25 7:55 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant, David G. Hellweg Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Margaret)
Related: [-] 25 ,12
Monday, October 24, 2022
25 25 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 10/24 11:24 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Andrew Lennox WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: *(1) Pretrial Conference (2) Motion for Entry of Default against David G. Hellweg Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew) (Doc. 12) - Enter Clerk's Default O/Case Manager Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/08 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/07/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Thu 10/06 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #21 )
22 22 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Wed 10/05 2:30 PM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
21 21 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Mon 10/03 2:52 PM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing regarding the Pretrial Conference and the Motion for Entry of Default Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Lisa M.)
Related: [-] 19 ,12
Friday, September 23, 2022
20 20 misc Proof of Service (AP) Fri 09/23 9:28 AM
Proof of Service of Order Continuing Pretrial Conference. Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King Related [+]. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, September 22, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 09/22 2:27 PM
Order Continuing Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Andrew Lennox is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 7
18 18 misc Proof of Service (AP) Thu 09/22 11:46 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Seek Entry of Default. Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King Related [+]. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 order Extend Time Thu 09/22 7:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Seek Entry of Default Related [+]. Service Instructions: Andrew Lennox is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Nita)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 09/21 11:13 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-] 12
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Wed 09/21 9:05 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/24/2022 01:30 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Re: Motion for Entry of Default against David G. Hellweg Doc12 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : Andrew W Lennox is directed to prepare, file and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the notice must be done immediately. Failure to comply with this instruction will result in cancellation of the hearing on this specific matter. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 09/20 4:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Katie Brinson Hinton on behalf of Interested Party Richard Dauval. (Hinton, Katie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
15 15 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 09/20 5:19 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Casey Lennox RULING: Pretrial Conference - Pretrial Conference and (Doc 12) Motion for Entry of Default against David G. Hellweg set 10/24/22 at 1:30pm, (if the debtor intends to oppose relief requested in the complaint Debtor needs to appear at hearing) Order by Atty Lennox,,,***(Doc. 11 Motion to Extend Time to Seek Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff - Granted, Order submitted)*** Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Filing (AP) Fri 09/09 4:52 PM
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Non-Military Service Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King Related [+]. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Fri 09/09 4:51 PM
Motion for Entry of Default against David G. Hellweg Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Fri 09/09 4:49 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Seek Entry of Default Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/19 12:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/18/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Tue 08/16 9:30 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Thu 07/14 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Monday, July 11, 2022
7 7 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Mon 07/11 11:53 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/19/2022 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Penny)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, June 05, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 06/06 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Friday, June 03, 2022
5 5 order Extend Time Fri 06/03 3:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer until July 5, 2022 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Anel)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, June 02, 2022
4 4 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Thu 06/02 3:27 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant David G. Hellweg Related [+]. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, May 09, 2022
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 05/09 11:22 AM
Service Executed on David G. Hellweg of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Andrew W Lennox on behalf of Plaintiff Mary Amos-King. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Tue 05/03 1:31 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 06/02/2022. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
1 1 48 pgs cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Mon 05/02 4:58 PM
Complaint by Mary Amos-King against David G. Hellweg. (Fee Paid.) Nature of Suit: [41 (Objection / Revocation of Discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))],[67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)],[68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)]. (Lennox, Andrew)
Related: [-]