Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Danny C Reeves
Case #: 5:22-cv-00130
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2022 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
Dr. Christina Howard
Represented By
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University Of Kentucky
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kamika Joyner
Represented By
LeeAnne Edmonds Applegate
Cabinet For Health & Family Services - Frankfort
contact info
Plaintiff
J. A. L.
Represented By
Christopher Blake Rambicure
Miller Edwards Rambicure PLLC
contact info
Mason L. Miller
Miller & Wells, PLLC
contact info
Carl D. Edwards, Jr.
Miller Edwards Rambicure Pllc - Lexington
contact info
Plaintiff
L. L.
Represented By
Christopher Blake Rambicure
Miller Edwards Rambicure PLLC
contact info
Mason L. Miller
Miller & Wells, PLLC
contact info
Carl D. Edwards, Jr.
Miller Edwards Rambicure Pllc - Lexington
contact info
Plaintiff
B. P.
Represented By
Christopher Blake Rambicure
Miller Edwards Rambicure PLLC
contact info
Mason L. Miller
Miller & Wells, PLLC
contact info
Carl D. Edwards, Jr.
Miller Edwards Rambicure Pllc - Lexington
contact info

GPO Oct 04 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Dft.'s Motions to Dismiss 10 & 11 are GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/04/2022.(JER)cc: COR

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 14, 2023
20 20 appeal USCA Order Fri 04/14 3:35 PM
ORDER of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by J. A. L. Appeal dismissed pursuant to parties' stipulation to dismiss. No Mandate to issue.(GLD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover letter
Monday, March 13, 2023
19 19 appeal USCA Order Generic Mon 03/13 2:56 PM
ORDER of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by J. A. L. ORDER filed to dismiss Kamika Joyner as party to the appeal. (JLM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
18 18 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 11/02 9:29 AM
USCA Case Number 22-5966 Case Manager Roy G. Ford for17 Notice of Appeal filed by J. A. L. (MDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 10/31 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions,16 Judgment, by J. A. L.(Individually). Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AKYEDC-5400780. (Rambicure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
16 16 order Judgment Tue 10/04 8:34 AM
JUDGMENT: 1) Claims asserted by Ptfs. J.A.L. and L.L., individually and as parents of J.B.L. and C.L., and B.P.'s claims against Dfts. Christina Howard and Kamika Joyner are DISMISSED with prejudice. 2) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/4/2022.(JER)
Related: [-]
15 15 26 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Terminate Motions Tue 10/04 8:31 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Dft.'s Motions to Dismiss10 &11 are GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/04/2022.(JER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
utility Motion Submitted Thu 08/25 9:36 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kamika Joyner ,11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Christina Howard First Amended Complaint (KJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
14 14 respoth Reply Brief Wed 08/24 10:27 PM
REPLY BRIEF to10 Defendant Joyner's Motion to Dismiss filed by Kamika Joyner. (Applegate, LeeAnne)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/24 4:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Christina Howard First Amended Complaint filed by Christina Howard. (Morgan, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/10 8:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Christina Howard First Amended Complaint ,10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kamika Joyner (combined response) filed by J. A. L.(Individually), J. A. L., L. L.(Individually), L. L., B. P.. (Rambicure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/20 4:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Christina Howard First Amended Complaint(Morgan, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/20 3:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kamika Joyner(Applegate, LeeAnne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Safety Plan,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Order for Trial Home Visit,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Stipulating to Probable Cause,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Temporary Custody Orders,
Att: 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Joyner
9 9 respoth Notice of Appearance Wed 07/20 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina Howard. (Thro, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order Terminate Motions Thu 07/07 8:41 AM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendant Kamika Joyner's4 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim and Defendant Cristina Howard's5 MOTION to Dismiss are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/7/2022.(KM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
7 7 respm Response to Motion Wed 07/06 7:06 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kamika Joyner ,5 MOTION to Dismiss by Christina Howard filed by J. A. L.(Individually), J. A. L., L. L.(Individually), L. L., B. P.. (Rambicure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/06 4:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(1)(B) against Christina Howard, Kamika Joyner, filed by L. L.(Individually), J. A. L.(Individually), B. P., L. L., J. A. L..(Rambicure, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
5 5 motion Dismiss Wed 06/15 4:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Christina Howard(Morgan, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 06/15 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kamika Joyner(Applegate, LeeAnne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Trial Visit Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C Safety Plan,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D Temporary Custody Orders,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E Hearing Order,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting
Friday, May 20, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/20 3:29 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically(JER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons -Joyner
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/20 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5271628), filed by L. L.(Individually), J. A. L.(Individually), B. P., L. L., J. A. L..(JER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redacted Verification Pages,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons -Howard,
Att: 4 Summons -Joyner
notice Notice for Attorney to Update Address Fri 05/20 3:32 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Christopher B. Rambicure: Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JER)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Update Address Fri 05/20 3:34 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE EMAIL ADDRESS to Carl D. Edwards: Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your email address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JER)
Related: [-]
notice Notice for Attorney to Update Address Fri 05/20 3:35 PM
NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE EMAIL ADDRESS to Mason L. Miller: Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your email address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JER)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Fri 05/20 3:36 PM
Conflict Check run. (JER)
Related: [-]