Original Case: 5:22-cv-00130

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-05966
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2022
Terminated:Apr 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 17, 2023 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
DOCTOR CHRISTINA HOWARD, In her Individual Capacity
Represented By
Mary Ann Miranda
University of Kentucky
contact info
Bryan Howard Beauman
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney
contact info
Donald C. Morgan
Sturgill, Turner, Barker & Moloney
contact info
William Eugene Thro
University of Kentucky
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KAMIKA JOYNER, In her Individual Capacity
Represented By
LeeAnne Edmonds Applegate
Kentucky Cabinet for Health & Family Services
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
J. A. L.
Represented By
Christopher Blake Rambicure
Miller Edwards Rambicure
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
L. L., Individually and as parents of J.B.L. and C.L., minors
Represented By
Christopher Blake Rambicure
Miller Edwards Rambicure
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
B. P.
Represented By
Christopher Blake Rambicure
Miller Edwards Rambicure
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2023 3:32 AM CDT
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants J. A. L., L. L. and B. P.. Transcript needed: n. (RGF)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/12/2022;. appellee brief due 01/11/2023; (RGF)
Related: [-]