Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11259

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:22-ap-50363
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 25, 2022
Terminated:Dec 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Colby Auto Investments, Inc.
2126 W Deer Valley Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85027
Represented By
Colby Auto Investments, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC, Trustee of the Advantage Rent A Car Unsecured Creditor Trust Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Sarah M Ennis
Morris James LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, December 29, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/29 8:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-50363 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/17 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/15 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Wed 12/14 12:23 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Colby Auto Investments, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 12/14/2022. (DRG)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, December 12, 2022
11 11 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 12/12 9:20 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Colby Auto Investments, Inc Related [+] Signed on 12/12/2022. (NR)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, December 09, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/09 4:33 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. (Ennis, Sarah)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Thursday, December 08, 2022
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Thu 12/08 3:55 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. (Ennis, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Thu 12/08 3:53 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. (Ennis, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Entry of Default
Thursday, October 27, 2022
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/27 10:52 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/1/2022 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 09/29 10:48 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/3/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Fri 09/02 11:47 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/7/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keilson, Brya)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 07/29 5:32 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Colby Auto Investments, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2022 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Ennis, Sarah)
Related: [-] ument3
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 07/26 3:26 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Colby Auto Investments, Inc.. Related [+] (Ennis, Sarah)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 26, 2022
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 05/26 11:35 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50363 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 93922, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 05/25 4:15 PM
Adversary case 22-50363 Complaint by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC against Colby Auto Investments, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 8/23/2022. (Ennis, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives