ACF FINCO I LP v. LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:22-ap-01090 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC.
5525 N. MACARTHUR BLVD., STE. 625
IRVING, TX 75039 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ACF FINCO I LP
ATTN: TALITHA GRAY KOZLOWSKI, ESQ. 7251 AMIGO STREET SUITE 210
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 23, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/23 2:27 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mmm) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Wed 10/12 7:56 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/30/2023 at 10:30 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Tue 10/11 9:56 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 10/13/2022 10:00 AM. Continued. (Hearing scheduled 03/30/2023 at 10:30 AM at MKN Teleconference Line. (sm) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 03/30/3023 Hearing Time: 10:30 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Service Executed on LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC. 6/30/2022 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued on LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC. (cly) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 06/29 4:08 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC.. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Service Executed on LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC. 6/7/2022 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued on LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC. (mmm) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Tue 05/31 10:46 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Fri 05/27 6:47 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC.. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01090 Complaint COMPLAINT TO AVOID AND RECOVER PREFERENTIAL TRANSFERS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. SECTIONS 547 AND 550 Filed by ACF FINCO I LP vs. LIQUID CAPITAL EXCHANGE, INC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |