ACF FINCO I LP v. NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:22-ap-01092 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
1780 BARNES BLVD. SW
TUMWATER, WA 98512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ACF FINCO I LP
ATTN: TALITHA GRAY KOZLOWSKI, ESQ. 7251 AMIGO STREET SUITE 210
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 08/24 9:19 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Service Executed on NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC. 6/7/2022 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued on NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC. (mmm) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Tue 05/31 10:51 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Fri 05/27 6:48 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC.. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01092 Complaint COMPLAINT TO AVOID AND RECOVER PREFERENTIAL TRANSFERS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. SECTIONS 547 AND 550 Filed by ACF FINCO I LP vs. NAVIA BENEFIT SOLUTIONS, INC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |