Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:22-ap-01101
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 27, 2022
Terminated:Apr 18, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
UNITED RENTALS, INC.
225 ASYLUM STREET, 20TH FLR.
HARTFORD, CT 06103
Represented By
UNITED RENTALS, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
ACF FINCO I LP
ATTN: TALITHA GRAY KOZLOWSKI, ESQ. 7251 AMIGO STREET SUITE 210
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Represented By
TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI
Bankruptcy Recovery Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/18 2:26 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
18 18 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Thu 03/30 2:58 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP,17 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
17 17 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 03/30 8:28 AM
Stipulation By ACF FINCO I LP and Between United Rentals, Inc. Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Vacating All Hearings Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
16 16 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Wed 03/29 3:25 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 3/30/2023 10:30 AM. Continued. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 10/12/2023 at 01:30 PM at MKN Teleconference Line. (sm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by ACF FINCO I LP
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
15 15 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 03/28 9:12 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 01:30 PM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Monday, March 27, 2023
14 14 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Mon 03/27 4:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
13 13 notice Hearing (Adv) Mon 03/27 9:35 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 10/12/2023 Hearing Time: 1:30 P.M. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+](GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Friday, March 24, 2023
12 12 notice Hearing (Adv) Fri 03/24 5:44 PM
Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF CONTINUED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing Date: 10/12/2023 Hearing Time: 1:30 p.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+](GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Friday, October 14, 2022
11 11 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Fri 10/14 2:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
10 10 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 10/12 9:08 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/30/2023 at 10:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (cly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
9 9 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Tue 10/11 10:02 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 10/13/2022 10:00 AM. Continued. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 03/30/2023 at 10:30 AM at MKN Teleconference Line. (sm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by ACF FINCO I LP
Friday, October 07, 2022
8 8 notice Hearing (Adv) Fri 10/07 1:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 03/30/2023 Hearing Time: 10:30 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+](GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 06/28 1:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by BENJAMIN B. CHILDS SR. on behalf of UNITED RENTALS, INC. (CHILDS, BENJAMIN)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/08 3:11 PM
Summons Service Executed on UNITED RENTALS, INC. 6/7/2022 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP Related [+] (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP,4 Summons Issued.
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
5 5 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 05/31 11:15 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 05/31 11:14 AM
Summons Issued on UNITED RENTALS, INC. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
3 3 cmp Request to Issue Summons Fri 05/27 6:54 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: UNITED RENTALS, INC.. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 05/27 6:14 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/27 2:26 PM
Adversary case 22-01101 Complaint COMPLAINT TO AVOID AND RECOVER PREFERENTIAL AND UNAUTHORIZED POST-PETITION TRANSFERS PURUSANT TO 11 U.S.C. SECTIONS 547, 549 AND 550 Filed by ACF FINCO I LP vs. UNITED RENTALS, INC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
Related: [-]