California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:22-cv-03481
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2022
Terminated:Aug 15, 2022
Case in other court:Superior Court of CA, County of San Francisco, CGC22599497
Last checked: Saturday Dec 10, 2022 1:12 AM PST
Defendant
BraunHagey & Borden LLP
351 California St, Fl 10 San Francisco
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
Ronald James Fisher
Braunhagey & Borden LLP
contact info
Ellen Valentik Leonida
Braunhagey & Borden
contact info
Plaintiff
LTC (BVI) Limited
Represented By
Sanjeet Sham Ganjam
Shartsis Friese LLP
contact info
Frank A. Cialone
Shartsis Friese LLP
contact info
Richard F. Munzinger
Shartsis Friese LLP
contact info
Joel Zeldin
Shartsis Friese LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
41 41 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 02/28 12:36 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
40 40 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 02/23 3:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that motion hearing previously set for 2/27/2024 is vacated and a written order will follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
39 39 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 02/13 3:52 PM
REPLY Related [+] In Support Of Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed byLTC (BVI) Limited.(Ganjam, Sanjeet)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION for Attorney Fees
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 02/06 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Sanjeet Sham Ganjam of Shartsis Friese LLP (Ganjam, Sanjeet)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
37 37 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 01/31 8:25 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byBraunHagey & Borden LLP.(Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION for Attorney Fees
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ronald J. Fisher,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Fisher Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Fisher Declaration
Monday, January 22, 2024
36 36 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/22 10:24 PM
Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 35 Stipulation Re: 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/22 10:47 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re34 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP. (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/22 10:27 PM
Set Deadlines as to34 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Defendant BHB's Opposition due by 1/31/2024. Plaintiff LTC's Reply due by 2/13/2024. Hearing on Plaintiff LTC's Motion for Attorneys' Fees set for 2/27/2024, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
34 34 motion Attorney Fees Wed 01/10 3:25 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by LTC (BVI) Limited. Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing set for 2/27/2024 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/24/2024. Replies due by 1/31/2024.(Ganjam, Sanjeet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
33 33 appeal USCA Order Wed 12/27 2:38 PM
ORDER of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
32 32 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 08/18 11:39 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to28 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
31 31 appeal USCA Memorandum Thu 07/27 2:11 PM
USCA Memorandum -DISMISSED as to28 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
30 30 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 08/23 1:52 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF REMAND DOCUMENTS as to27 Clerk's Notice. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
29 29 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 08/18 3:44 PM
USCA for the Ninth Circuit Case Number 22-16252 for28 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
28 28 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Tue 08/16 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number CCANDC-17447069 paid.) (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
27 27 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 08/16 1:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding Case to San Francisco Superior Court. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
26 26 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Remand Mon 08/15 4:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 17 MOTION TO REMAND IN PART; DENYING 14 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS MOOT. (amg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
25 25 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 08/02 4:43 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byLTC (BVI) Limited.(Ganjam, Sanjeet)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C)
Att: 1 Declaration
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 08/02 4:34 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byLTC (BVI) Limited.(Munzinger, Richard)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C)
Att: 1 Declaration
Thursday, July 28, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 07/28 7:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the17 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C) previously set for 8/16/2022 is vacated. The Court will reset if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
22 22 misc Proposed Order Wed 07/27 1:40 PM
Proposed Order re21 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C) by BraunHagey & Borden LLP. (Leonida, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
21 21 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 07/26 6:47 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byBraunHagey & Borden LLP. (Leonida, Ellen)
Related: [-] 17 MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C)
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/13 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Valentik Leonida (Leonida, Ellen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 07/12 7:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 18 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND ENLARGING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION. (amg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 07/12 10:49 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Enlarging Plaintiff's Time to File Opposition re14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To Rule 12(C) filed by LTC (BVI) Limited. Responses due by 7/18/2022.(Ganjam, Sanjeet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Remand Tue 07/12 9:23 AM
MOTION to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1447(C) filed by LTC (BVI) Limited. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/26/2022. Replies due by 8/2/2022.(Ganjam, Sanjeet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Sanjeet S. Ganjam,
Att: 2 Declaration of James M. Schwarz,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 30, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/30 12:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To Rule 12(C) previously noticed for 8/2/2022 is continued to 8/16/2022 at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , Set/Reset Deadlines as to14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To Rule 12(C) . Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (amg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
15 15 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 06/29 8:27 PM
Declaration of Ronald Fisher in Support of14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To Rule 12(C) [Corrected] filed byBraunHagey & Borden LLP. Related [+] (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
14 14 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 06/29 7:01 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To Rule 12(C) filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/13/2022. Replies due by 7/20/2022.(Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Fisher,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, June 27, 2022
13 13 misc Jury Demand Mon 06/27 11:07 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BraunHagey & Borden LLP.(Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 06/21 8:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BraunHagey & Borden LLP (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 06/20 9:42 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr] General Order 58. P ersons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (amg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/17 8:50 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/17/2022.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, June 16, 2022
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BraunHagey & Borden LLP.. (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
7 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
6 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Civil Cover Sheet by BraunHagey & Borden LLP .(Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, June 13, 2022
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BraunHagey & Borden LLP (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by BraunHagey & Borden LLP (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by BraunHagey & Borden LLP . (Fisher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Francisco with jury demand. Their case number is CGC-22-599497. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BCANDC-17260684). Filed by BraunHagey & Borden LLP.(Fisher, Ronald) Modified on 6/15/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Answer to Removal Complaint by BraunHagey & Borden LLP. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]