Original Case: 4:22-cv-03481

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-16252
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 18, 2022
Terminated:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2023 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellant
BRAUNHAGEY & BORDEN LLP
Represented By
Ronald James Fisher
BraunHagey & Borden LLP
contact info
Ellen Valentik Leonida
BraunHagey & Borden LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LTC (BVI) LIMITED
Represented By
Sanjeet S. Ganjam
Shartsis Friese, LLP
contact info
Joel Zeldin
Shartsis Friese, LLP
contact info
Richard F. Munzinger
Shartsis Friese, LLP
contact info
Frank A. Cialone
Shartsis Friese, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/30/2023 1:22 AM PDT
Thursday, August 18, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant BraunHagey & Borden LLP Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/25/2022. Appellant BraunHagey & Borden LLP opening brief due 10/19/2022. Appellee LTC (BVI) Limited answering brief due 11/21/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12520228] (RT) [Entered: 08/18/2022 02:29 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet