Original Case: 1:10-cv-02622

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-03699
Typecivil / private / civil rights-prisoner
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2014
Terminated:Aug 12, 2016
Last checked: Monday Sep 08, 2014 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
DISTRICT ATTORNEY LUZERNE COUNTY
Represented By
Matthew J. Carmody
Elliott Greenleaf & Dean
contact info
David Z. Lantz
Elliott Greenleaf & Dean
contact info
John G. Dean
Elliott Greenleaf & Dean
contact info
Sean P. McDonough
Dougherty, Leventhal & Price
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY BEARD
Represented By
Maria Macus-Bryan
Pennsylvania Department of Corrections
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PRISON HEALTH SERVICES
Represented By
Kathryn M. Kenyon
Pietragallo, Gordon, Alfano, Bosick & Raspanti
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHRIS MEYERS
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDRE JACOBS
Represented By
Andre Jacobs
Albion SCI
contact info

GPO Aug 12 2016
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION, granting Appellant's motion to file supplemental reply brief. Coram: AMBRO, GREENAWAY JR. and GARTH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 7.

Docket last updated: 09/08/2014 6:24 AM EDT
Friday, September 05, 2014
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SMW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Andre Jacobs in District Court No. 1-10-cv-02622. (SMW)
Related: [-]
ORDER (Clerk)for all parties represented by Maria G. Macus, Esq., or any other attorney from the PA Dept of Corrections, the designated filer shall be Jefferey A. Beard for docketing purposes. Counsel is directed to choose this party designation when filing electronically, filed. (SMW)
Related: [-]