Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Referred: Eb
Case #: 1:10-cv-02622
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2010
Re-opened:May 22, 2017
Terminated:Aug 07, 2014
Defendant
Ankrom
Defendant
Attorney General's Office
Defendant
B. Corbin
Defendant
Barrier
Defendant
Bath
Defendant
Baumbach
Defendant
Baumbaugh
Defendant
Belles
Defendant
Berrier
Defendant
Bohinski
Defendant
Brian Coleman
Defendant
Brittain
Defendant
Brozowski
Defendant
Burgess
Defendant
C. J. McKeown
Defendant
C/O Drucis
Defendant
C/O Howal
Defendant
C/O Keller
Defendant
C/O Knarr
Defendant
C/O Kovac
Defendant
C/O Stroutman
Defendant
Candice Lackey
Defendant
Capt. Leggett
Defendant
Capt. Lt. Eueland
Defendant
Capt. Trumpus
Defendant
Capt. Zakarauckus
Defendant
Care
Defendant
Chalker
Defendant
Charlene Schuster
Defendant
Cheryl Bunk
Defendant
Chief Counsel
Defendant
Chris Meyers
Defendant
Christopher J. Wilson
Defendant
Cicerchia
Defendant
Collins
Defendant
Connie Green
Defendant
Counselor Keller
Defendant
Court
Defendant
Darlene Linderman
Defendant
David Link
Defendant
David Mosier
Defendant
David Pedri
Defendant
David Popek
Defendant
David Varano
Defendant
Delbasco
Defendant
Dep. Gates
Defendant
DePiero
Defendant
Devers
Defendant
District Attorney's Office
Defendant
Dorina Varner
Defendant
Dr. Jesse
Defendant
E. Bohn
Defendant
Edward Manchez
Defendant
Elmore
Defendant
Emerich
Defendant
Erdley
Defendant
Eveland
Defendant
Gary Abrams
Defendant
Gary Davis
Defendant
Gary Gallucci
Defendant
Goodwin
Defendant
Gooler
Defendant
Harrison
Defendant
Herman Hughes
Defendant
Hoover
Defendant
J. Keller
Defendant
Jacqueling Musto Carroll
Defendant
James Barnacle
Defendant
Jeffery A. Beard
Defendant
Jerome Walsh
Defendant
John Barry Johnson
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
John Doe 1-2
Defendant
John Doe 3
Defendant
John Does 1-2
Defendant
John Does 1-4
Defendant
John Does 4-6
Defendant
John Does 5-10
Defendant
John Does 6-18
Defendant
John L. Mann
Defendant
John Wetzel
Defendant
Joseph Trempus
Defendant
Joseph Zakarauckus
Defendant
Kandis Dascani
Defendant
Kandis Daslani
Defendant
Kathryn McCarthy
Defendant
Kauffman
Defendant
Keins
Defendant
Kepner
Defendant
Kerri Cross
Defendant
Kevin Miskell
Defendant
Konshenik
Defendant
Kopec
Defendant
Krah
Defendant
Kristin Reisinger
Defendant
L. S. Kerns-Barr
Defendant
Larry Mahally
Defendant
Leonard
Defendant
Lt. Barrier
Defendant
Lt. Bliech
Defendant
Lt. Faust
Defendant
Lt. Martin
Defendant
Lt. Patterson
Defendant
Lt. Rudon
Defendant
Lt. Stetler
Defendant
Lt. Tift
Defendant
Lt. Vojacek
Defendant
M. Garman
Defendant
Marc D. Goldberg
Defendant
Maryann Kushner
Defendant
McCoy
Defendant
McMillian
Defendant
MHM
Defendant
Michael Klopotoski
Defendant
Mike Goyne
Defendant
Mike Zaken
Defendant
Miller
Defendant
Nancy Fedor
Defendant
Nicole Klem
Defendant
Norm Demming
Defendant
Nurse Patty
Defendant
Office of Professional Responsibility
Defendant
Ontko
Defendant
P. Yetter
Defendant
PA Ryan Davis
Defendant
Piepzowski
Defendant
Pohlidal
Defendant
Poper
Defendant
Prison Health Service
Defendant
Provow
Defendant
Psychiatrist Laski
Defendant
Psychologist Ms. Stevens
Defendant
Pudlosky
Defendant
Purcelle
Defendant
Rhonda Ellett
Defendant
Rhonda House
Defendant
Richard S. Ellers
Defendant
Robert Bitner
Defendant
Robert MacIntyre
Defendant
Robin Lucas
Defendant
Robowleski
Defendant
Rudaski
Defendant
S. Tabbie
Defendant
S. Tubble
Defendant
Scolls
Defendant
Scott
Defendant
Scott Nickelson
Defendant
Scromski
Defendant
Sgt. Buck
Defendant
Sgt. Martina
Defendant
Sgt. Ransom
Defendant
Sgt. Schomport
Defendant
Sgt. Young
Defendant
Sharon M. Burks
Defendant
Shipe
Defendant
Shirley Moore Smeal
Defendant
Starzynski
Defendant
Stitler
Defendant
Supt. Lawler
Defendant
Therese Jellen
Defendant
Thomas Carmody
Defendant
Thomas Lescowsky
Defendant
Tom Corbett
Defendant
Tom Rovinski
Defendant
Tracy Williams
Defendant
U. M. Hughes
Defendant
Vincent Mooney
Defendant
Walters
Defendant
Wildes
Defendant
Wilds
Defendant
Wilk
Defendant
Zielen
Plaintiff
Andre Jacobs

GPO Jul 17 2013
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 70 MOTION for Reconsideration is DENIED. 62 Signed by Chief Judge Yvette Kane on 7/16/13. SEE MEMORANDUM FOR DETAILS. (sc)
GPO Sep 30 2013
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that, The motions to dismiss and/or strike the amended complaint filed by Defendants Ryan and Prison Health Services 84, the Commonwealth Defendants 87 and Defendants Dr. Jesse and MHM 95 are GRANTED. The amended complaint filed by Plaintiff 83 is STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. The Clerk of Court is directed to make the appropriate notation on the docket. Within twenty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in accordance with the standard identified in the accompanying Memorandum. Plaintiffs motion for extension of time/to stay this case 97 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/30/13. (pw)
GPO Aug 07 2014
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/7/14. (sc)
GPO Aug 07 2014
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs motion to accept modified version of the complaint (Doc. No. 107) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to return to SCI-Albions Financial Department the check previously submitted by Plaintiff along with this motion, and the prison shall ensure that said funds are re-deposited into Plaintiffs inmate account. 2. Plaintiffs motion to transfer case (Doc. No. 110) is denied. 3. Defendants motion to strike (Doc. No. 114) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the proposed second amended complaint (Doc. No. 113) from the record. Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 116) is dismissed as moot. 4. Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. No. 1) is dismissed for failure to prosecute. 5. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. 116 110 114 113 107 Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/7/14. (sc)
GPO Mar 19 2018
MEMORANDUM re dfts' mtns to dismiss 144 148 155 and 161 (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/19/18. (ma)
GPO Mar 19 2018
ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 167; 1. Dfts Prison Health Services, Inc., Chris Meyers, Stanley Bohinski, and Brian Davis mtn to dismiss 144, is GRANTED, and these Dfts are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice;2. Dfts District Attorneys Office, David Pedri, and Jacqueline Musto-Carrolls mtn to dismiss 148, is GRANTED, and these Dfts are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice;3. Dfts MHM Services, Inc. and Dr. Jane Jesses mtn to dismiss 155, is GRANTED, and these Dfts are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice;4. Dfts Department of Corrections (DOC) partial mtn to dismiss 161, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;5. The DOC Dfts mtn is GRANTED to the extent that: (a) Dfts Chief Counsel, Bath, Lt. Poper, James Wilk, Philip Walters, Thomas Harrison, Guard Depiero, Robert Care, Lt. Devers, Bradley Scott, Lt. James Eveland, Lt. Stitler, McKeown, Mahally, Cicerchia, MacIntyre, Robowleski, Sgt. Brozowski, Hoover, Leonard, Piepzowski, Rudon, Ellett, McMillian, Dascani, Belles, Emerich, Kepner, Goodwin, Shipe, Tracey Williams, Manchez, Scromski, L.S. Kerns-Barr, Keller, Delbasco, Demming, Brittain, Mooney, Goyne, Rovinski, Starzinski, Lackey, Link, Abrams, Galluci, Hughes, Silvette, and S. Tubble, Ellers, Kopec, Pahlidal, Zielen, Barrier, and Keins are DISMISSED with prejudice;(b) Pltfs free-standing claim of failure to respond to grievances is DISMISSED with prejudice;(c) Pltfs verbal harassment claims are DISMISSED with prejudice;(d) Pltfs Eighth Amendment claims for denial of food, showers, and exercise are DISMISSED with prejudice;(e) Pltfs Fourth and Eighth Amendment claims relating to strip searches are DISMISSED with prejudice; and(f) Pltfs claims related to placement on the RRL are DISMISSED with prejudice;6. The DOC Dfts mtn is DENIED in all other respects;7. Dft Christopher Wilson is DISMISSED with prejudice; and8. The remaining DOC Dfts are DIRECTED to file an answer to the remaining claims in the amended complaint within (20) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/19/18. (ma)
GPO May 03 2019
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 185 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Andre Jacobs, 188 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs, 184 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Andre Jacobs, 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rudaski, Brian Coleman, Dep. Gates, Capt. Leggett, Elmore, McCoy, Lt. Bliech, Gooler, Mike Zaken, Jerome Walsh, Marc D. Goldberg, Kerri Cross, David Varano, Therese Jellen, Nancy Fedor, John Wetzel, Lt. Patterson, Sgt. Ransom, Chalker, Jeffery A. Beard, Shirley Moore Smeal, Sgt. Buck, Baumbach, Collins, Dorina Varner, Maryann Kushner, Rhonda House, Scott Nickelson, Provow, Michael Klopotoski, Lt. Vojacek, Joseph Zakarauckus, Miller, Robin Lucas, John Barry Johnson, David Mosier, Thomas Lescowsky, Wildes, Gary Davis, Lt. Faust, Lt. Martin. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/3/2019. (ve)
GPO May 03 2019
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs motion for sanctions (Doc. No. 185) is DENIED; 2. Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration and to compel discovery (Doc. No. 184) is GRANTED to the extent that discovery is REOPENED for a period of four (4) months from the date of this Order to allow the parties time to arrange the depositions Plaintiff seeks to conduct; 3. Defendants motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 182) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Defendants right to renew it once the reopened discovery period has closed; and 4. The Courts April 8, 2019 Order (Doc. No. 188) directing Defendants to file their brief in support of their motion for summary judgment is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/3/2019. (ve)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.