Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:22-cv-00776
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2022
Terminated:Sep 23, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2023 3:10 AM CST
Defendant
Qingdao Lashbeauty Cosmetic Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Li Guo
Steptoe & Johnson, LLP
contact info
Hui Shen
Steptoe & Johnson, LLP
contact info
John William Toth
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
B. Russell Horton
George, Brothers, Kincaid & Horton, L.L.P.
contact info
John M Caracappa
Steptoe & Johnson, LLP
contact info
Matthew Bathon
Steptoe & Johnson, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lashify, Inc.
Represented By
Saina S. Shamilov
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Jonathan Thomas McMichael
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Eric Arthur Menist
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Melanie L. Mayer
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, P.C.
contact info
Bryan A. Kohm
Fenwick & West LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 16 2024
ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Jan 16 2024
ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Jan 30 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 63 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Lashify, Inc., and order mooting 56 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
GPO Feb 14 2024
ORDER ADOPTING 113 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting in part 63 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
GPO Apr 04 2024
ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slm)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, February 17, 2025
390 390 transcript Transcript Filed Mon 02/17 10:05 AM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-23-24, Proceedings Transcribed: Jury Trial Volume 5. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/10/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025, (kd)
Related: [-]
389 389 transcript Transcript Filed Mon 02/17 10:05 AM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-22-24, Proceedings Transcribed: Jury Trial Volume 4. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/10/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025, (kd)
Related: [-]
388 388 transcript Transcript Filed Mon 02/17 10:04 AM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-21-24, Proceedings Transcribed: Jury Trial Volume 3. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/10/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025, (kd)
Related: [-]
387 387 transcript Transcript Filed Mon 02/17 10:03 AM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-20-24, Proceedings Transcribed: Jury Trial Volume 2. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/10/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025, (kd)
Related: [-]
386 386 transcript Transcript Filed Mon 02/17 10:02 AM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-19-24, Proceedings Transcribed: Jury Trial Volume 1. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis (kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com), Telephone number: 2546660904. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 3/10/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025, (kd)
Related: [-]
385 385 transcript Transcript of Sealed or In Camera Proceedings Filed Mon 02/17 10:00 AM
8-22-24 Jury Trial Volume 4 Sealed Transcript filed (This transcript is not available electronically) (kd)
Related: [-]
384 384 transcript Transcript of Sealed or In Camera Proceedings Filed Mon 02/17 9:58 AM
8-21-24 Jury Trial Volume 3 Sealed Transcript filed (This transcript is not available electronically) (kd)
Related: [-]
383 383 transcript Transcript of Sealed or In Camera Proceedings Filed Mon 02/17 9:58 AM
8-20-24 Jury Trial Volume 2 Sealed Transcript filed (This transcript is not available electronically) (kd)
Related: [-]