Original Case: 6:22-cv-00776

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-01123
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2024 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
QINGDAO LASHBEAUTY COSMETIC CO., LTD., dba Worldbeauty
Represented By
Brett L. Foster
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LASHIFY, INC.
Represented By
Andrew Alexander
Calfee, Halter & Griswold LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/21/2025 1:22 AM EST
Monday, October 28, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/22/2024. [1043042] Entry of Appearance is due on 11/12/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/12/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 11/12/2024. Appellant's brief is due on 12/27/2024. [IMH] [Entered: 10/28/2024 03:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 58 pgs Civil Case Docketed