Original Case: 1:21-cv-00067

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv.co-01728
Typecivil copyright / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2022
Terminated:Feb 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 13, 2022 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
DMARCIAN EUROPE BV
Represented By
Pressly McAuley Millen
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Samuel Batiste Hartzell
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DMARCIAN, INC.
Represented By
David Anthony Dorey
BLANK ROME LLP
contact info
Pamela Suzanne Duffy
SHARPLESS MCCLEARN LESTER DUFFY, PA
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2023
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. [1001315913] [21-1721, 21-2005, 22-1728]

Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 9:50 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
1 1 1 pgs Civil copyright case docketed. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/12/2022. Case manager: REdwards. [1001192017] 22-1728 RE [Entered: 07/12/2022 09:29 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] civil copyright case. Originating case number: 1:21-cv-00067-MR. [1001192021] 22-1728 RE [Entered: 07/12/2022 09:30 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001192027] Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/22/2022. Response Brief due 09/21/2022 22-1728 RE [Entered: 07/12/2022 09:33 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs ORDER filed consolidating case 22-1728 with 22-1721 Copies to all parties. [1001192296] 21-1721 21-2005 22-1728 RE [Entered: 07/12/2022 12:03 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER filed rescinding briefing order. Copies to all parties. [1001192303] 22-1728 RE [Entered: 07/12/2022 12:08 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. [1001192306] Supplemental Opening Brief due 08/22/2022. Supplemental Response Brief due 09/21/2022. 21-1721 21-2005 22-1728 RE [Entered: 07/12/2022 12:11 PM]
Related: [-]